Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Erin Capital Management Llc, filed a(n) General Small Claims - Small Claims case represented by Mindy Rennard, Esq, against Owens, Joyce S, in the jurisdiction of Pinellas County, FL, . Pinellas County, FL Superior Courts with JAGGER, EDWIN presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateSeptember 30, 2015 |
CategorySmall Claims 4 - $2,501 - $5,000 |
Last RefreshedSeptember 15, 2023 |
Practice AreaSmall Claims |
Filing LocationPinellas County, FL |
Matter TypeGeneral Small Claims |
STATEMENT OF CLAIM - E-FILED
Date: September 30, 2015ATTORNEY COVER LETTER RE:PROPOSED ORDER
Date: November 18, 2015SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED NOT USED BY CLERK
Date: September 30, 2015NOTICE-STMT OF CLAIM-DEFT Party: OWENS, JOYCE S
Date: October 02, 2015ORDER APPROVING STIPULATION AND DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE Vol./Book 18994, Page 1071, 2 pages
Date: November 18, 2015SUMMONS-NOTICE EMAILED TO ATTY-PLTF FOR SERVICE Party: OWENS, JOYCE S
Date: October 02, 2015STIPULATION FOR SETTLEMENT AND DISMISSAL
Date: November 06, 2015NOTICE TO APPEAR - SERVED
Date: October 26, 2015NOTICE TO PLTF-PLTF ATTY
Date: October 02, 2015Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
November 18, 2015 | Docket Event |
ATTORNEY COVER LETTER RE:PROPOSED ORDER
Judge: SMALL CLAIMS JUDGE, SOUTH |
|
November 18, 2015 | Docket Event |
ORDER APPROVING STIPULATION AND DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE Vol./Book 18994, Page 1071, 2 pages
Judge: SMALL CLAIMS JUDGE, SOUTH |
|
November 06, 2015 | Docket Event |
STIPULATION FOR SETTLEMENT AND DISMISSAL
Judge: SMALL CLAIMS JUDGE, SOUTH |
|
November 06, 2015 | Docket Event |
CASE DISMISSED - AFTER HEARING (SRS DISPOSITION)
Judge: SMALL CLAIMS JUDGE, SOUTH |
|
October 26, 2015 | Docket Event |
NOTICE TO APPEAR - SERVED
Judge: SMALL CLAIMS JUDGE, SOUTH |
|
October 22, 2015 | Docket Event |
SMALL CLAIMS PRE TRIAL ICD (2:00 PM) (Judicial Officer JAGGER, EDWIN) Result: SC HEARING HELD
Judge: SMALL CLAIMS JUDGE, SOUTH |
|
October 22, 2015 | Docket Event |
PRE-TRIAL CONTINUED PEND SETTLEMENT
Judge: SMALL CLAIMS JUDGE, SOUTH |
|
October 02, 2015 | Docket Event |
NOTICE-STMT OF CLAIM-DEFT Party: OWENS, JOYCE S
Judge: SMALL CLAIMS JUDGE, SOUTH |
|
October 02, 2015 | Docket Event |
SUMMONS-NOTICE EMAILED TO ATTY-PLTF FOR SERVICE Party: OWENS, JOYCE S
Judge: SMALL CLAIMS JUDGE, SOUTH |
|
October 02, 2015 | Docket Event |
NOTICE TO PLTF-PLTF ATTY
Judge: SMALL CLAIMS JUDGE, SOUTH |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.