Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Zaney, Don, filed a(n) General Small Claims - Small Claims case represented by Bruce Kirkpatrick Eason, Esq, against Urso, Joseph, in the jurisdiction of Pinellas County, FL, . Pinellas County, FL Superior Courts with JAGGER, EDWIN presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateSeptember 30, 2015 |
CategorySmall Claims 3 - $501 - $2,500 |
Last RefreshedOctober 06, 2023 |
Practice AreaSmall Claims |
Filing LocationPinellas County, FL |
Matter TypeGeneral Small Claims |
This complaint is a statement of claim regarding a landlord/tenant dispute over a security deposit refund. The plaintiff, Don Zaney, is suing the defendant, Joseph Urso, for damages in excess of $500 but not exceeding $2500. The plaintiff was a resid...
(NON RECORDED) NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL
Date: March 21, 2016DUTY JUDGE RESPONSE SHEET
Date: March 15, 2016NOTICE-STMT OF CLAIM-DEFT ON AMENDED//RESENT 1/25/15 CORRECTED ADDRESS Party: URSO, JOSEPH
Date: January 22, 2016EXHIBIT A-CERTIFIED MAIL ITEM #
Date: March 09, 2016AMENDED COMPLAINT
Date: January 15, 2016EXHIBIT B-ACCEPTANCE OF PROCESS JOSEPH URSO
Date: March 09, 2016STATEMENT OF CLAIM - E-FILED
Date: September 30, 2015AFFIDAVIT OF COMPLIANCE
Date: March 09, 2016NOTICE-STMT OF CLAIM-DEFT Party: URSO, JOSEPH
Date: October 02, 2015REQUEST FOR SUMMONS
Date: January 15, 2016NOTICE TO PLTF-PLTF ATTY ON AMENDED
Date: January 22, 2016NOTICE TO PLTF-PLTF ATTY
Date: October 02, 2015SUMMONS-NOTICE EMAILED TO ATTY-PLTF FOR SERVICE Party: URSO, JOSEPH
Date: October 02, 2015SUMMONS-NOTICE EMAILED TO ATTY-PLTF FOR SERVICE Party: URSO, JOSEPH
Date: January 22, 2016Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 21, 2016 | Docket Event |
(NON RECORDED) NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL
Judge: SMALL CLAIMS JUDGE, SOUTH |
|
March 21, 2016 | Docket Event |
CASE DISMISSED - AFTER HEARING (SRS DISPOSITION)
Judge: SMALL CLAIMS JUDGE, SOUTH |
|
March 15, 2016 | Docket Event |
DUTY JUDGE RESPONSE SHEET
Judge: SMALL CLAIMS JUDGE, SOUTH |
|
March 10, 2016 | Docket Event |
SMALL CLAIMS PRE TRIAL ICD (9:30 AM) (Judicial Officer HESSINGER, KATHLEEN T) Result: SC HEARING HELD
Judge: SMALL CLAIMS JUDGE, SOUTH |
|
March 10, 2016 | Docket Event |
PRE-TRIAL CONTINUED PEND SERVICE
Judge: SMALL CLAIMS JUDGE, SOUTH |
|
March 09, 2016 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT A-CERTIFIED MAIL ITEM #
Judge: SMALL CLAIMS JUDGE, SOUTH |
|
March 09, 2016 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT B-ACCEPTANCE OF PROCESS JOSEPH URSO
Judge: SMALL CLAIMS JUDGE, SOUTH |
|
March 09, 2016 | Docket Event |
AFFIDAVIT OF COMPLIANCE
Judge: SMALL CLAIMS JUDGE, SOUTH |
|
January 22, 2016 | Docket Event |
NOTICE-STMT OF CLAIM-DEFT ON AMENDED//RESENT 1/25/15 CORRECTED ADDRESS Party: URSO, JOSEPH
Judge: SMALL CLAIMS JUDGE, SOUTH |
|
January 22, 2016 | Docket Event |
NOTICE TO PLTF-PLTF ATTY ON AMENDED
Judge: SMALL CLAIMS JUDGE, SOUTH |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.