Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Advanced Nutrient Science International Llc, filed a(n) General Commercial - Commercial case represented by John J Agliano, against Betty Lous Inc, in the jurisdiction of Pinellas County, FL, . Pinellas County, FL Superior Courts with SCHAEFER, JOHN presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateNovember 30, 2015 |
CategoryBusiness Transactions |
Last RefreshedFebruary 20, 2021 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationPinellas County, FL |
Matter TypeGeneral Commercial |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 29, 2017 | Docket Event | EXHIBIT | |
May 02, 2017 | Docket Event | CANCELED DISMISSAL DATE FOR LACK OF PROSECUTION (12:00 AM) (Judicial Officer SCHAEFER, JOHN A) CASE DISMISSED | |
May 02, 2017 | Docket Event |
CANCELED DISMISSAL DATE FOR LACK OF PROSECUTION (12:00 AM) (Judicial Officer SCHAEFER, JOHN A) CASE DISMISSED
Judge: ST. ARNOLD, JACK R |
|
March 09, 2017 | Docket Event | (NON RECORDED) NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSALBY PLTF | |
March 09, 2017 | Docket Event | CASE DISMISSED - BEFORE HEARING (SRS DISPOSITION) | |
March 09, 2017 | Docket Event |
(NON RECORDED) NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL BY PLTF
Judge: ST. ARNOLD, JACK R |
|
March 01, 2017 | Docket Event | NOTICE-LACK OF PROSECUTION MAILED TO ALL PARTIES | |
March 18, 2016 | Docket Event | WAIVERAND ACCEPTANCE OF SERVICE OF PROCESS | |
March 18, 2016 | Docket Event |
WAIVER AND ACCEPTANCE OF SERVICE OF PROCESS
Judge: ST. ARNOLD, JACK R |
|
March 14, 2016 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF UNAVAILABILITY |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.