Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
filed a(n) case in the jurisdiction of Pinellas County, FL, . Pinellas County, FL Superior Courts with Lorraine M. Kelly presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateSeptember 30, 2015 |
|
Last RefreshedSeptember 16, 2023 |
|
Filing LocationPinellas County, FL |
|
CIVIL COVER SHEET - E-FILED
Date: September 30, 2015CERTIFIED MAIL RECEIPT-TRACKING SLIP
Date: April 11, 2016SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED ISSUED ON 10-05-15
Date: September 30, 2015ATTACHMENT TO COMPLAINT PAYMENT HISTORY
Date: September 30, 2015MOTION TO TRANSFER CASE Filed by: SHAW, MARIE A
Date: March 11, 2016ORDER GRANTING PLTF MOTION TO TRANSER CASE
Date: March 15, 2016COMPLAINT
Date: September 30, 2015SUMMONS - NOT SERVED Party: AICHER, BRYAN
Date: December 29, 2015RECEIPT FOR ORIGINAL CASE FILE
Date: April 11, 2016CERTIFIED MAIL RECEIPT RETURNED
Date: April 14, 2016CORRESPONDENCE FROM CLERK RE TRANSFER FEES DUE
Date: March 17, 2016RECEIPT RE: TRANSFER
Date: April 15, 2016Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 15, 2016 | Docket Event |
RECEIPT RE: TRANSFER
Judge: KELLY, LORRAINE |
|
April 14, 2016 | Docket Event |
CERTIFIED MAIL RECEIPT RETURNED
Judge: KELLY, LORRAINE |
|
April 11, 2016 | Docket Event |
CERTIFIED MAIL RECEIPT-TRACKING SLIP
Judge: KELLY, LORRAINE |
|
April 11, 2016 | Docket Event |
RECEIPT FOR ORIGINAL CASE FILE
Judge: KELLY, LORRAINE |
|
April 11, 2016 | Docket Event |
(((((FILE VERIFIED TO THIS DATE))))) AK
Judge: KELLY, LORRAINE |
|
April 11, 2016 | Docket Event |
DO NOT DOCKET - CASE CONSOLIDATED OR TRANSFERRED
Judge: KELLY, LORRAINE |
|
April 11, 2016 | Docket Event |
CASE TRANSFERRED (SRS DISPOSITION) SARASOTA COUNTY
Judge: KELLY, LORRAINE |
|
March 17, 2016 | Docket Event |
CORRESPONDENCE FROM CLERK RE TRANSFER FEES DUE
Judge: KELLY, LORRAINE |
|
March 15, 2016 | Docket Event |
ORDER GRANTING PLTF MOTION TO TRANSER CASE
Judge: KELLY, LORRAINE |
|
March 11, 2016 | Docket Event |
MOTION TO TRANSFER CASE Filed by: SHAW, MARIE A
Judge: KELLY, LORRAINE |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.