Case Last Refreshed: 4 months ago
Demers, Neil E, filed a(n) Landlord-Tenant - Property case represented by Benjamin D Keener, Esq, against Hollett, Troy, in the jurisdiction of Pinellas County, FL, . Pinellas County, FL Superior Courts with JAGGER, EDWIN presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateSeptember 30, 2015 |
CategoryDelinquent Tenant - County |
Last RefreshedDecember 18, 2023 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationPinellas County, FL |
Matter TypeLandlord-Tenant |
This complaint is a Florida Residential Lease Agreement between Neil E Demers (referred to as the "Landlord") and Ciara Kelley & Troy Hollett (referred to as the "Tenant"). The agreement states that the Landlord owns a property located at 266 Maple A...
CERTIFICATE OF MAILING Party: HOLLETT, TROY Party: KELLEY, CIARA
Date: October 06, 2015DEFAULT ENTERED Party: HOLLETT, TROY
Date: October 16, 2015NOTICE OF FILING VERIFIED RETURN OF SERVICE OF EVICTION SUMMONS
Date: October 13, 2015WRIT OF POSSESSION RETD EXECUTED
Date: October 29, 2015WRIT OF POSSESSION ISSUED 10/22/2015
Date: October 22, 2015COMPLAINT
Date: September 30, 2015SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED ISSUED ON 10/1/15
Date: September 30, 2015CIVIL COVER SHEET - E-FILED
Date: September 30, 2015ATTACHMENT TO COMPLAINT NOTICE FROM LANDLORD
Date: October 01, 2015ATTACHMENT TO COMPLAINT LEASE
Date: October 01, 2015PLTF-PET'S MOTION FOR DEFAULT
Date: October 14, 2015AFFIDAVIT AS TO MILITARY SERVICE
Date: October 14, 2015(NON RECORDED) NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL OF CIARA KELLEY W/O PREJ
Date: October 15, 2015PLTF-PET'S MOTION FOR FINAL JUDGMENT
Date: October 16, 2015FINAL JUDGMENT- COUNT 1 POSSESSION Vol./Book 18960, Page 1536, 1 pages
Date: October 19, 2015Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 29, 2015 | Docket Event |
WRIT OF POSSESSION RETD EXECUTED
Judge: JAGGER, EDWIN |
|
October 22, 2015 | Docket Event |
WRIT OF POSSESSION ISSUED 10/22/2015
Judge: JAGGER, EDWIN |
|
October 19, 2015 | Docket Event |
FINAL JUDGMENT- COUNT 1 POSSESSION Vol./Book 18960, Page 1536, 1 pages
Judge: JAGGER, EDWIN |
|
October 19, 2015 | Docket Event |
DEFAULT JUDGMENT (SRS DISPO)
Judge: JAGGER, EDWIN |
|
October 16, 2015 | Docket Event |
DEFAULT ENTERED Party: HOLLETT, TROY
Judge: JAGGER, EDWIN |
|
October 16, 2015 | Docket Event |
PLTF-PET'S MOTION FOR FINAL JUDGMENT
Judge: JAGGER, EDWIN |
|
October 15, 2015 | Docket Event |
(NON RECORDED) NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL OF CIARA KELLEY W/O PREJ
Judge: JAGGER, EDWIN |
|
October 14, 2015 | Docket Event |
PLTF-PET'S MOTION FOR DEFAULT
Judge: JAGGER, EDWIN |
|
October 14, 2015 | Docket Event |
AFFIDAVIT AS TO MILITARY SERVICE
Judge: JAGGER, EDWIN |
|
October 13, 2015 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF FILING VERIFIED RETURN OF SERVICE OF EVICTION SUMMONS
Judge: JAGGER, EDWIN |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.