Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
J3 Advanced Engineering Technologies Inc A Montana Corporation, filed a(n) General Commercial - Commercial case represented by Paul B Thanasides, against Fogel, Bruce, represented by Matthew E Wolper, in the jurisdiction of Pinellas County, FL, . Pinellas County, FL Superior Courts with SCHAEFER, JOHN A presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateSeptember 30, 2015 |
CategoryBusiness Transactions |
Last RefreshedFebruary 20, 2021 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationPinellas County, FL |
Matter TypeGeneral Commercial |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 09, 2018 | Docket Event | MASTER ORDER OF DISMISSAL Doc # 2FOGEL, BRUCEVol./Book 19939, Page 1678, 2 pages | |
February 09, 2018 | Docket Event | CASE DISMISSED - AFTER HEARING (SRS DISPOSITION) Doc # 3 | |
February 06, 2018 | Docket Event | DISMISSAL DATE FOR LACK OF PROSECUTION (12:00 AM) (Judicial Officer SCHAEFER, JOHN A) | |
December 07, 2017 | Docket Event | NOTICE-LACK OF PROSECUTION MAILED TO ALL PARTIES Doc # 1 | |
December 23, 2016 | Docket Event | STIPULATIONOF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL W/PREJUDICE | |
November 09, 2016 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES(SECOND SET) | |
October 20, 2016 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF SERVICE OFSUPPLEMENTAL RESPONSES TO REQUESTS FOR PRODUCTION | |
October 18, 2016 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF SERVICE OFRESPONSES TO COUNTER-PLAINTIFF BRUCE FOGEL'S REQUESTS FOR PRODUCTION | |
August 17, 2016 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF APPEARANCEFOR THIRD PARTY DEFTS | |
August 03, 2016 | Docket Event | ORDER GRANTINGMARK BERSETS MOTION TO COMPEL BRUCE FOGELS RESPONSES |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.