Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Achieva Credit Union A Florida Chartered Credit Union, filed a(n) General Creditor - Creditor case represented by Victor H Veschio, Esq, against Champ, William R, Jr, in the jurisdiction of Pinellas County, FL, . Pinellas County, FL Superior Courts with MINKOFF, THOMAS H presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateSeptember 30, 2015 |
CategoryContracts And Indebtedness - Circuit |
Last RefreshedFebruary 20, 2021 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationPinellas County, FL |
Matter TypeGeneral Creditor |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 19, 2016 | Docket Event | CC JUDGMENT MADE-HANDED RECORDING | |
February 15, 2016 | Docket Event | FINAL SUMMARY JUDGMENTVol./Book 19086, Page 2205, 2 pages | |
February 15, 2016 | Docket Event | FINAL DISPOSITION FORM | |
February 15, 2016 | Docket Event | DEFAULT JUDGMENT (SRS DISPO) | |
January 08, 2016 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF HEARING02/11/16 9:00 | |
January 04, 2016 | Docket Event | AFFIDAVIT OF ATTORNEY FEES(REASONABLE) | |
December 28, 2015 | Docket Event | DEFAULT ENTEREDParty: CHAMP, WILLIAM R, JR | |
December 23, 2015 | Docket Event | PLTF-PET'S MOTION FOR PARTIAL SUMMARY JUDGMENT | |
December 23, 2015 | Docket Event | AFFIDAVIT OF INDEBTEDNESSW/BUSINESS RECORDS | |
December 23, 2015 | Docket Event | AFFIDAVIT AS TO COSTS |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.