Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Hylton, Alisa Noelle, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case against Hylton, Chad Edward, in the jurisdiction of Pinellas County, FL, . Pinellas County, FL Superior Courts with MEYER, KEITH presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJune 30, 2015 |
CategoryDissolution Of Marriage - With Children |
Last RefreshedOctober 26, 2022 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationPinellas County, FL |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
November 24, 2015 | Docket Event |
CERTIFIED STATEMENT COMPLETED BY CLERK
Judge: MEYER, KEITH |
|
November 18, 2015 | Docket Event |
RECOMMENDATION OF GENERAL MAGISTRATE
Judge: MEYER, KEITH |
|
November 18, 2015 | Docket Event |
FINAL DISPOSITION FORM
Judge: MEYER, KEITH |
|
November 18, 2015 | Docket Event |
FINAL JUDGMENT OF DISSOLUTION Vol./Book 18995, Page 169, 1 pages
Judge: MEYER, KEITH |
|
September 22, 2015 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF HEARING 10/28/15 9:00
Judge: MEYER, KEITH |
|
August 13, 2015 | Docket Event |
ORDER OF REFERENCE TO GENERAL MAGISTRATE
Judge: MEYER, KEITH |
|
July 29, 2015 | Docket Event |
RESPONDENT'S FINANCIAL STATEMENT-AFFIDAVIT
Judge: MEYER, KEITH |
|
July 24, 2015 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF FILING ATTACHED CHILD SUPPORT GUIDELINES WORKSHEET AS EXHIBIT 1
Judge: MEYER, KEITH |
|
July 24, 2015 | Docket Event |
PLTF-PET'S MOTION TO DEVIATE FROM CHILD SUPPORT GUIDELINES
Judge: MEYER, KEITH |
|
July 21, 2015 | Docket Event |
CLERK DENIAL OF CONFIDENTIAL INFORMATION PLEADINGS NOT COVERED BY RULE
Judge: MEYER, KEITH |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.