Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Lewis, Kenyortta Nicole, filed a(n) Domestic Violence - Family case against Mcduffy, Charlie J, Jr, in the jurisdiction of Pinellas County, FL, . Pinellas County, FL Superior Courts with MEYER, KEITH presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJune 30, 2015 |
CategoryDomestic Violence Injunction With Kids |
Last RefreshedJanuary 12, 2022 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationPinellas County, FL |
Matter TypeDomestic Violence |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 23, 2015 | Docket Event |
ORDER OF REFERENCE TO GENERAL MAGISTRATE AND NOTICE OF HRG 072315 9:45
Judge: MEYER, KEITH |
|
July 23, 2015 | Docket Event |
SWORN STATEMENT OF POSSESSION OF FIREARMS ETC
Judge: MEYER, KEITH |
|
July 23, 2015 | Docket Event |
FINAL JUDGMENT OF INJUNCTION-DOM VIOLENCE 072316 Vol./Book 18862, Page 800, 9 pages
Judge: MEYER, KEITH |
|
July 23, 2015 | Docket Event |
FINAL DISPOSITION FORM
Judge: MEYER, KEITH |
|
July 23, 2015 | Docket Event |
DOMESTIC VIOLENCE INJUNCTION WITH CHILDREN (9:00 AM) (Judicial Officer MUSCARELLA, PATRICIA ANN)
Judge: MEYER, KEITH |
|
July 23, 2015 | Docket Event |
RECOMMENDATION OF GENERAL MAGISTRATE /ORDER TIMESHARING
Judge: MEYER, KEITH |
|
July 14, 2015 | Docket Event |
AFFIDAVIT-SERVICE OF PROCESS TEMP INJUNCTION 070115 Party: MCDUFFY, CHARLIE J, JR
Judge: MEYER, KEITH |
|
July 10, 2015 | Docket Event |
ORDER OF CONTINUANCE /RESCHEDULING RETURN HEARING 072315 9:00
Judge: MEYER, KEITH |
|
July 09, 2015 | Docket Event |
DOMESTIC VIOLENCE INJUNCTION WITH CHILDREN (10:30 AM) (Judicial Officer MUSCARELLA, PATRICIA ANN)
Judge: MEYER, KEITH |
|
June 30, 2015 | Docket Event |
PETITION (SRS)
Judge: MEYER, KEITH |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.