Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Portfolio Recovery Associates Llc, filed a(n) General Small Claims - Small Claims case represented by Brian Mario Bilodeau, against Conde, David, in the jurisdiction of Pinellas County, FL, . Pinellas County, FL Superior Courts with JAGGER, EDWIN presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJune 30, 2015 |
CategorySmall Claims 4 - $2,501 - $5,000 |
Last RefreshedOctober 27, 2022 |
Practice AreaSmall Claims |
Filing LocationPinellas County, FL |
Matter TypeGeneral Small Claims |
EXHIBIT BILL OF SALE
Date: June 30, 2015AFFIDAVIT
Date: June 30, 2015SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED NOT USED BY CLERK
Date: June 30, 2015EXHIBIT ACCOUNT SUMMARY
Date: June 30, 2015COMPLAINT E-FILED
Date: June 30, 2015CIVIL COVER SHEET - E-FILED
Date: June 30, 2015NOTICE TO PLTF-PLTF ATTY
Date: July 02, 2015AFFIDAVIT OF NON-SERVICE
Date: July 23, 2015NOTICE-STMT OF CLAIM-DEFT Party: CONDE, DAVID
Date: July 02, 2015(NON RECORDED) NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE
Date: July 24, 2015CANCELED SMALL CLAIMS PRE-TRIAL (2:00 PM) (Judicial Officer JAGGER, EDWIN) NON-SERVICE
Date: August 13, 2015Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 13, 2015 | Docket Event |
CANCELED SMALL CLAIMS PRE-TRIAL (2:00 PM) (Judicial Officer JAGGER, EDWIN) NON-SERVICE
Judge: SMALL CLAIMS JUDGE, SOUTH |
|
July 24, 2015 | Docket Event |
(NON RECORDED) NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE
Judge: SMALL CLAIMS JUDGE, SOUTH |
|
July 24, 2015 | Docket Event |
CASE DISMISSED - BEFORE HEARING (SRS DISPOSITION)
Judge: SMALL CLAIMS JUDGE, SOUTH |
|
July 23, 2015 | Docket Event |
AFFIDAVIT OF NON-SERVICE
Judge: SMALL CLAIMS JUDGE, SOUTH |
|
July 02, 2015 | Docket Event |
SUMMONS-NOTICE EMAILED TO ATTY-PLTF FOR SERVICE Party: CONDE, DAVID Party: PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES LLC
Judge: SMALL CLAIMS JUDGE, SOUTH |
|
July 02, 2015 | Docket Event |
NOTICE TO PLTF-PLTF ATTY
Judge: SMALL CLAIMS JUDGE, SOUTH |
|
July 02, 2015 | Docket Event |
NOTICE-STMT OF CLAIM-DEFT Party: CONDE, DAVID
Judge: SMALL CLAIMS JUDGE, SOUTH |
|
June 30, 2015 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT BILL OF SALE
Judge: SMALL CLAIMS JUDGE, SOUTH |
|
June 30, 2015 | Docket Event |
AFFIDAVIT
Judge: SMALL CLAIMS JUDGE, SOUTH |
|
June 30, 2015 | Docket Event |
SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED NOT USED BY CLERK
Judge: SMALL CLAIMS JUDGE, SOUTH |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.