Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
6522 54Th Llc, filed a(n) Landlord-Tenant - Property case against Robinson, Brian Anthony, Robinson, Sarah Jane, in the jurisdiction of Pinellas County, FL, . Pinellas County, FL Superior Courts with HESSINGER, KATHLEEN T presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeHESSINGER, KATHLEEN T Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJune 30, 2015 |
CategoryDelinquent Tenant - County |
Last RefreshedJuly 15, 2022 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationPinellas County, FL |
Matter TypeLandlord-Tenant |
WRIT OF POSSESSION RETD UNEXECUTED
Date: August 07, 2015Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 07, 2015 | Docket Event |
WRIT OF POSSESSION RETD UNEXECUTED
Judge: HESSINGER, KATHLEEN T |
|
August 03, 2015 | Docket Event |
WRIT OF POSSESSION ISSUED TO SHERIFF
Judge: HESSINGER, KATHLEEN T |
|
July 31, 2015 | Docket Event |
WRIT OF POSSESSION RECEIVED WITH CHECK
Judge: HESSINGER, KATHLEEN T |
|
July 27, 2015 | Docket Event |
FINAL DISPOSITION FORM
Judge: HESSINGER, KATHLEEN T |
|
July 24, 2015 | Docket Event |
DEFAULT JUDGMENT (SRS DISPO)
Judge: HESSINGER, KATHLEEN T |
|
July 24, 2015 | Docket Event |
FINAL JUDGMENT- COUNT 1 POSSESSION Vol./Book 18865, Page 226, 1 pages
Judge: HESSINGER, KATHLEEN T |
|
July 23, 2015 | Docket Event |
UNSIGNED ORDER SENT TO JUDGE FJ W/ENVS
Judge: HESSINGER, KATHLEEN T |
|
July 23, 2015 | Docket Event |
DEFAULT ENTERED COUNT I Party: ROBINSON, BRIAN ANTHONY Party: ROBINSON, SARAH JANE
Judge: HESSINGER, KATHLEEN T |
|
July 22, 2015 | Docket Event |
PLTF-PET'S MOTION FOR DEFAULT
Judge: HESSINGER, KATHLEEN T |
|
July 22, 2015 | Docket Event |
PLTF-PET'S MOTION FOR FINAL JUDGMENT (DEFAULT) COUNT I PRO SE
Judge: HESSINGER, KATHLEEN T |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.