Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Cavalry Spv I Llc, filed a(n) General Small Claims - Small Claims case represented by Jorge L Palma, Esq, against Silvers, Patricia, in the jurisdiction of Pinellas County, FL, . Pinellas County, FL Superior Courts with CARASSAS, JOHN presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeCARASSAS, JOHN Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateMay 29, 2015 |
CategorySmall Claims 3 - $501 - $2,500 |
Last RefreshedOctober 23, 2022 |
Practice AreaSmall Claims |
Filing LocationPinellas County, FL |
Matter TypeGeneral Small Claims |
AFFIDAVIT OF NON-SERVICE
Date: July 02, 2015NOTICE OF CONFIDENTIAL INFORMATION WITHIN COURT FILE
Date: May 29, 2015EXHIBIT SUMMARY OF ACCOUNT ACTIVITY
Date: May 29, 2015EXHIBIT BILL OF SALE
Date: May 29, 2015EXHIBIT ACCOUNT INFORMATION
Date: May 29, 2015CIVIL COVER SHEET - E-FILED
Date: May 29, 2015STATEMENT OF CLAIM - E-FILED
Date: May 29, 2015SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED NOT USED BY CLERK
Date: May 29, 2015AFFIDAVIT OF NON-SERVICE
Date: June 29, 2015SUMMONS-NOTICE EMAILED TO ATTY-PLTF FOR SERVICE Party: SILVERS, PATRICIA
Date: June 03, 2015NOTICE OF APPEARANCE
Date: June 30, 2015NOTICE TO PLTF-PLTF ATTY
Date: June 03, 2015NOTICE-STMT OF CLAIM-DEFT Party: SILVERS, PATRICIA
Date: June 03, 2015ATTACHMENT SUMMONS/NOTICE TO APPEAR
Date: June 29, 2015ATTACHMENT SUMMONS/NOTICE TO APPEAR
Date: July 02, 2015NOTICE OF LACK OF PROSECUTION RETD BY P.O. PLTF ATTY INSANA @ UPDATED ADDRESS
Date: January 27, 2016NOTICE OF LACK OF PROSECUTION RETD BY P.O. UNKNOWN ADDRESS FOR PLTF ATTY INSANA
Date: January 27, 2016MASTER ORDER OF DISMISSAL SILVERS, PATRICIA Vol./Book 19098, Page 2044, 4 pages
Date: February 26, 2016Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 05, 2016 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF LACK OF PROSECUTION RETD BY P.O. UNKNOWN ADDRESS FOR DEFT PATRICIA SILVERS
Judge: SMALL CLAIMS JUDGE, NORTH |
|
February 26, 2016 | Docket Event |
MASTER ORDER OF DISMISSAL SILVERS, PATRICIA Vol./Book 19098, Page 2044, 4 pages
Judge: SMALL CLAIMS JUDGE, NORTH |
|
February 26, 2016 | Docket Event |
CASE DISMISSED - BEFORE HEARING (SRS DISPOSITION)
Judge: SMALL CLAIMS JUDGE, NORTH |
|
February 16, 2016 | Docket Event |
DISMISSAL-FAILURE TO PROSECUTE-SC (12:00 AM) (Judicial Officer CARASSAS, JOHN)
Judge: SMALL CLAIMS JUDGE, NORTH |
|
January 27, 2016 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF LACK OF PROSECUTION RETD BY P.O. PLTF ATTY INSANA @ UPDATED ADDRESS
Judge: SMALL CLAIMS JUDGE, NORTH |
|
January 27, 2016 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF LACK OF PROSECUTION RETD BY P.O. UNKNOWN ADDRESS FOR PLTF ATTY INSANA
Judge: SMALL CLAIMS JUDGE, NORTH |
|
January 15, 2016 | Docket Event |
NOTICE-LACK OF PROSECUTION MAILED TO ALL PARTIES
Judge: SMALL CLAIMS JUDGE, NORTH |
|
July 02, 2015 | Docket Event |
AFFIDAVIT OF NON-SERVICE
Judge: SMALL CLAIMS JUDGE, NORTH |
|
July 02, 2015 | Docket Event |
ATTACHMENT SUMMONS/NOTICE TO APPEAR
Judge: SMALL CLAIMS JUDGE, NORTH |
|
June 30, 2015 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE
Judge: SMALL CLAIMS JUDGE, NORTH |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.