Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Express Auto Glass Llc, filed a(n) General Small Claims - Small Claims case represented by Marc B Nussbaum, Esq, against Geico General Insurance Company, represented by Lucy Deutscher, in the jurisdiction of Pinellas County, FL, . Pinellas County, FL Superior Courts with HESSINGER, KATHLEEN presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeHESSINGER, KATHLEEN Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateMay 29, 2015 |
CategorySmall Claims 3 - $501 - $2,500 |
Last RefreshedSeptember 16, 2023 |
Practice AreaSmall Claims |
Filing LocationPinellas County, FL |
Matter TypeGeneral Small Claims |
EXHIBIT INVOICE
Date: June 20, 2016REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS
Date: May 29, 2015STATEMENT OF CLAIM - E-FILED
Date: May 29, 2015STATEMENT OF GOOD CAUSE
Date: February 22, 2016NOTICE OF FILING INVOICE
Date: June 20, 2016DESIGNATION OF E-MAIL ADDRESS(ES)
Date: October 21, 2016ANSWER-AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES OF GEICO GENERAL INSURANCE COMPANY
Date: July 29, 2015COMPLAINT E-FILED
Date: May 29, 2015NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES
Date: May 29, 2015EXHIBIT A- INVOICE
Date: May 29, 2015REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION
Date: May 29, 2015NOTICE TO PLTF-PLTF ATTY
Date: June 03, 2015NOTICE OF DISCLOSURE
Date: July 29, 2015NOTICE-STMT OF CLAIM-DEFT Party: GEICO GENERAL INSURANCE COMPANY
Date: June 03, 2015EXHIBIT A - INVOICE
Date: June 20, 2016NOTICE OF FILING INVOICE EXHIBIT A
Date: June 20, 2016NOTICE OF UNAVAILABILITY
Date: March 09, 2017NOTICE OF UNAVAILABILITY
Date: July 25, 2017NOTICE OF UNAVAILABILITY Doc # 1
Date: November 02, 2017(NON RECORDED) NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL Doc # 3 W/O PREJUDICE
Date: February 23, 2018Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 23, 2018 | Docket Event |
(NON RECORDED) NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL Doc # 3 W/O PREJUDICE
Judge: SMALL CLAIMS JUDGE, SOUTH |
|
February 23, 2018 | Docket Event |
CASE DISMISSED - AFTER HEARING (SRS DISPOSITION) Doc # 2
Judge: SMALL CLAIMS JUDGE, SOUTH |
|
November 02, 2017 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF UNAVAILABILITY Doc # 1
Judge: SMALL CLAIMS JUDGE, SOUTH |
|
July 25, 2017 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF UNAVAILABILITY
Judge: SMALL CLAIMS JUDGE, SOUTH |
|
March 09, 2017 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF UNAVAILABILITY
Judge: SMALL CLAIMS JUDGE, SOUTH |
|
November 18, 2016 | Docket Event |
MOTION SUMMARY JUDGMENT DISMISSAL OR ABATEMENT AND DETERMINATION OF ENTITLEMENT TO ATTYS FEES Party: GEICO GENERAL INSURANCE COMPANY
Judge: SMALL CLAIMS JUDGE, SOUTH |
|
October 21, 2016 | Docket Event |
DESIGNATION OF E-MAIL ADDRESS(ES)
Judge: SMALL CLAIMS JUDGE, SOUTH |
|
June 20, 2016 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT INVOICE
Judge: SMALL CLAIMS JUDGE, SOUTH |
|
June 20, 2016 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF FILING INVOICE
Judge: SMALL CLAIMS JUDGE, SOUTH |
|
June 20, 2016 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT A - INVOICE
Judge: SMALL CLAIMS JUDGE, SOUTH |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.