Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Midland Funding Llc, filed a(n) General Small Claims - Small Claims case represented by Robert A Winter, Esq, against Martin, Daniel, in the jurisdiction of Pinellas County, FL, . Pinellas County, FL Superior Courts with McNARY, MYRA SCOTT presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeMcNARY, MYRA SCOTT Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateMay 29, 2015 |
CategorySmall Claims 3 - $501 - $2,500 |
Last RefreshedOctober 13, 2023 |
Practice AreaSmall Claims |
Filing LocationPinellas County, FL |
Matter TypeGeneral Small Claims |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 22, 2021 | Docket Event |
SATISFACTION OF JUDGMENT Doc # 9
Judge: McNARY, MYRA SCOTT |
|
June 04, 2021 | Docket Event |
NOTICE Doc # 8 OF VOLUNTARY DISSOLUTION OF WRIT OF GARNISHMENT AS TO PARAGON WATER SYSTEMS INC
Judge: McNARY, MYRA SCOTT |
|
May 18, 2021 | Docket Event |
WRIT - SERVED Doc # 7 CONTINUING GARNISHMENT 05072021 Party: PARAGON WATER SYSTEM INC
Judge: McNARY, MYRA SCOTT |
|
May 13, 2021 | Docket Event |
NOTICE TO DEF & INTERESTED PARTIES Doc # 6
Judge: McNARY, MYRA SCOTT |
|
May 05, 2021 | Docket Event | REOPEN - CLOSED | |
May 05, 2021 | Docket Event |
CONTINUING WRIT OF GARNISHMENT SALARY-WAGES Doc # 5 / PAPAGON WATER SYSTEMS INC W/ATTACHMENT
Judge: McNARY, MYRA SCOTT |
|
May 03, 2021 | Docket Event |
PRAECIPE FOR RECORDATION OF JDMT AS LIEN Doc # 4
Judge: McNARY, MYRA SCOTT |
|
May 03, 2021 | Docket Event |
JUDGMENT LIEN (R) Doc # 3 Vol./Book 21517, Page 1931, 1 pages
Judge: McNARY, MYRA SCOTT |
|
November 20, 2020 | Docket Event |
MOTION FOR CONTINUING WRIT OF GARNISHMENT Doc # 2 PARAGON WATER SYSTEMS, INC. GARNISHEE Party: MIDLAND FUNDING LLC
Judge: McNARY, MYRA SCOTT |
|
November 20, 2020 | Docket Event |
CASE REOPENED Doc # 1
Judge: McNARY, MYRA SCOTT |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.