Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Wells Fargo Bank Na, filed a(n) Foreclosure - Property case represented by Sheri M Alter, against City Of St Petersburg Florida, Ross Johnson, Ian, Ross Johnson, Kathy D, represented by Bradley S Tennant, Mark P Stopa, in the jurisdiction of Pinellas County, FL, . Pinellas County, FL Superior Courts with WILLIAMS, AMY M presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeWILLIAMS, AMY M Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJune 30, 2015 |
CategoryReal Prop - Homestead Res Foreclosure3 $250,000 Or More |
Last RefreshedFebruary 20, 2021 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationPinellas County, FL |
Matter TypeForeclosure |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
November 28, 2018 | Docket Event | CERTIFICATE OF TITLE Doc # 45Vol./Book 20349, Page 1151, 1 pages | |
November 28, 2018 | Docket Event | CERTIFICATE OF DISBURSEMENTS Doc # 46 | |
November 14, 2018 | Docket Event | JUDICIAL ONLINE SALE (10:00 AM) (Judicial Officer ONLINE SALE, JUDICIAL) REC VER | |
November 14, 2018 | Docket Event | CERTIFICATE OF SALE Doc # 44STEPHEN B KING 1/4 INTEREST | |
November 02, 2018 | Docket Event | PUBLISHER'S AFFIDAVIT NOTICE OF SALE Doc # 43 | |
October 18, 2018 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF SALE Doc # 42***ESF PAID*** | |
September 12, 2018 | Docket Event | ORDER RESCHED ONLINE SALE Doc # 40111418 | |
September 12, 2018 | Docket Event | CORRESPONDENCE TO COURT RE Doc # 41PROPOSED ORDER - RECEIVED BY COURT 083018 | |
August 23, 2018 | Docket Event | PLTF-PET'S MOTION TO RESET-RESCHEDULE FORECLOSURE SALE Doc # 39 | |
July 10, 2018 | Docket Event | DCA ORDER Doc # 38DENYING AS MOOT APPELLANT'S MOTION TO ABATE |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.