Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Knighten, Tonia Lynn, Guardian, filed a(n) General Commercial - Commercial case represented by Robert J Healy, Jr, against Bayside Gymnastics And Cheerleading Inc, represented by David I Wynne Jr, Esq, in the jurisdiction of Pinellas County, FL, . Pinellas County, FL Superior Courts with DAY, JACK presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeDAY, JACK Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateMay 29, 2015 |
CategoryNegligence - Premises Liability - Commercial |
Last RefreshedSeptember 06, 2023 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationPinellas County, FL |
Matter TypeGeneral Commercial |
RESPONSE Doc # 2 TO EXPERT REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION
Date: November 15, 2017AMENDED Doc # 4 WITNESS AND EXHIBIT LISTS
Date: November 15, 2017NOTICE OF SERVICE OF Doc # 3 ANSWERS TO EXPERT INTERROGATORIES
Date: November 15, 2017NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION Doc # 6
Date: December 12, 2017RESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION Doc # 1 (SUPPLEMENTAL)
Date: November 15, 2017WITNESS LIST Doc # 5 (DEFT AMENDED)
Date: December 11, 2017MOTION Doc # 7 TO EXTEND DISCOVERY CUTOFF (JOINT)
Date: December 18, 2017AMENDED Doc # 10 RESPONSE TO PLAINTIFF'S EXPERT REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION
Date: January 04, 2018NOTICE OF SERVICE OF Doc # 9 AMENDED ANSWERS TO PLAINTIFF'S EXPERT WITNESS INTERROGATORIES
Date: January 04, 2018NOTICE OF HEARING Doc # 12 042018 3:00
Date: February 02, 2018NOTICE OF MEDIATION CONFERENCE Doc # 11 031618 9:30
Date: January 31, 2018JOINT STIPULATION Doc # 15 FOR DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE
Date: June 13, 2018Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 26, 2018 | Docket Event |
ORDER OF DISMISSAL Doc # 16 W/ PREJUDICE BY PLTF Vol./Book 20121, Page 749, 1 pages
Judge: DAY, JACK |
|
June 13, 2018 | Docket Event |
CASE DISMISSED - AFTER HEARING (SRS DISPOSITION) Doc # 14
Judge: DAY, JACK |
|
June 13, 2018 | Docket Event |
JOINT STIPULATION Doc # 15 FOR DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE
Judge: DAY, JACK |
|
March 19, 2018 | Docket Event |
NOTICE FINAL DISPOSITION OF REFERRAL Doc # 13 FULL AGREEMENT
Judge: DAY, JACK |
|
February 02, 2018 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF HEARING Doc # 12 042018 3:00
Judge: DAY, JACK |
|
January 31, 2018 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF MEDIATION CONFERENCE Doc # 11 031618 9:30
Judge: DAY, JACK |
|
January 04, 2018 | Docket Event |
AMENDED Doc # 10 RESPONSE TO PLAINTIFF'S EXPERT REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION
Judge: DAY, JACK |
|
January 04, 2018 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF SERVICE OF Doc # 9 AMENDED ANSWERS TO PLAINTIFF'S EXPERT WITNESS INTERROGATORIES
Judge: DAY, JACK |
|
December 22, 2017 | Docket Event |
ORDER GRANTING Doc # 8 PLTF AND DEFT JOINT MOTN TO EXTEND DISCOVERY CUTOFF
Judge: DAY, JACK |
|
December 18, 2017 | Docket Event |
MOTION Doc # 7 TO EXTEND DISCOVERY CUTOFF (JOINT)
Judge: DAY, JACK |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.