Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Global Secure Epay Llc A Nevada Limited Liability Company, filed a(n) General Creditor - Creditor case represented by Omar M Salazar, Ii, against Gorodinski, Lev, Individually, represented by Stephen O Cole, Esq, in the jurisdiction of Pinellas County, FL, . Pinellas County, FL Superior Courts with DAY, JACK presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeDAY, JACK Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateMay 29, 2015 |
CategoryContracts And Indebtedness - Circuit |
Last RefreshedFebruary 20, 2021 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationPinellas County, FL |
Matter TypeGeneral Creditor |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 19, 2017 | Docket Event | JUDGMENT (SRS) Doc # 3 | |
October 19, 2017 | Docket Event | FINAL JUDGMENT Doc # 2IN FAVOR OF LEV GORODINSKIVol./Book 19815, Page 2349, 2 pages | |
October 19, 2017 | Docket Event | CORRESPONDENCE TO COURT RE Doc # 4PROPOSED JUDGMENT - RECEIVED BY COURT 101817 | |
October 16, 2017 | Docket Event | JOINT STIPULATION Doc # 1FOR ENTRY OF JUDGMENT | |
July 31, 2017 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF FILINGBY DEFT OF AFFIDAVIT | |
July 31, 2017 | Docket Event | AFFIDAVITOF STEPHEN O COLE IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR DETERMINATION OF AWARD OF ATTORNEYS FEES / COSTS (SECOND SUPPLEMENTAL) | |
July 31, 2017 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF SERVICE OFDISCOVERY RESPONSES | |
July 27, 2017 | Docket Event | RESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION | |
July 24, 2017 | Docket Event | REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION(SECOND) | |
June 30, 2017 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF SERVICE OFREQUEST FOR PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTS FOR EVIDENTIARY HEARING |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.