Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
filed a(n) case in the jurisdiction of Pinellas County, FL, . Pinellas County, FL Superior Courts with Myra Scott McNary presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 31, 2014 |
|
Last RefreshedOctober 06, 2023 |
|
Filing LocationPinellas County, FL |
|
This complaint is filed by Plaintiff MIDLAND FUNDING LLC against Defendant KAREN ACHHAMER. The damages being claimed in this action do not exceed $5,000, excluding interest and court costs. The Plaintiff is a Delaware Limited Liability Company author...
SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED NOT USED BY CLERK
Date: December 31, 2014SMALL CLAIMS PRE TRIAL ICD (9:30 AM) (Judicial Officer McNARY, MYRA SCOTT) Result: SC HEARING HELD
Date: September 08, 2015NOTICE-STMT OF CLAIM-DEFT Party: ACHHAMER, KAREN
Date: January 07, 2015COMPLAINT E-FILED
Date: January 05, 2015AFFIDAVIT OF NON-SERVICE
Date: February 09, 2015EXHIBIT ACCOUNT STATEMENT
Date: January 05, 2015ORDER OF DISMISSAL APPROVING STIPULATION Vol./Book 18962, Page 1024, 1 pages
Date: October 20, 2015SMALL CLAIMS PRE TRIAL ICD (3:00 PM) (Judicial Officer CARASSAS, JOHN) Result: SC HEARING HELD
Date: February 10, 2015REQUEST FOR ALIAS SUMMONS
Date: August 12, 2015CIVIL COVER SHEET - E-FILED
Date: December 31, 2014SUMMONS-NOTICE EMAILED TO ATTY-PLTF FOR SERVICE Party: ACHHAMER, KAREN
Date: January 07, 2015ALIAS NOTICE TO APPEAR - SERVED
Date: August 28, 2015NOTICE TO PLTF-PLTF ATTY
Date: January 07, 2015SUMMONS-NOTICE EMAILED TO ATTY-PLTF FOR SERVICE Party: ACHHAMER, KAREN
Date: August 13, 2015CORRESPONDENCE TO COURT RE PROPOSED ORDER
Date: October 20, 2015ALIAS NOTICE-STMT OF CLAIM-DEFT VIA ATTORNEY Party: ACHHAMER, KAREN
Date: August 13, 2015ALIAS NOTICE TO PLTF-PLTF ATTY
Date: August 13, 2015STIPULATION FOR SETTLEMENT
Date: October 15, 2015Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 20, 2015 | Docket Event |
ORDER OF DISMISSAL APPROVING STIPULATION Vol./Book 18962, Page 1024, 1 pages
Judge: McNARY, MYRA SCOTT |
|
October 20, 2015 | Docket Event |
CORRESPONDENCE TO COURT RE PROPOSED ORDER
Judge: McNARY, MYRA SCOTT |
|
October 20, 2015 | Docket Event |
CASE DISMISSED - AFTER HEARING (SRS DISPOSITION)
Judge: McNARY, MYRA SCOTT |
|
October 15, 2015 | Docket Event |
STIPULATION FOR SETTLEMENT
Judge: McNARY, MYRA SCOTT |
|
September 08, 2015 | Docket Event |
SMALL CLAIMS PRE TRIAL ICD (9:30 AM) (Judicial Officer McNARY, MYRA SCOTT) Result: SC HEARING HELD
Judge: McNARY, MYRA SCOTT |
|
September 08, 2015 | Docket Event |
DEFAULT-JUDGMENT UPON RECEIPT OF AFFDS IN PROOF OF CLAIM, COST
Judge: McNARY, MYRA SCOTT |
|
August 28, 2015 | Docket Event |
ALIAS NOTICE TO APPEAR - SERVED
Judge: McNARY, MYRA SCOTT |
|
August 13, 2015 | Docket Event |
SUMMONS-NOTICE EMAILED TO ATTY-PLTF FOR SERVICE Party: ACHHAMER, KAREN
Judge: McNARY, MYRA SCOTT |
|
August 13, 2015 | Docket Event |
ALIAS NOTICE-STMT OF CLAIM-DEFT VIA ATTORNEY Party: ACHHAMER, KAREN
Judge: McNARY, MYRA SCOTT |
|
August 13, 2015 | Docket Event |
ALIAS NOTICE TO PLTF-PLTF ATTY
Judge: McNARY, MYRA SCOTT |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.