Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
United One Insurance Franchise Company Llc, filed a(n) General Creditor - Creditor case represented by Joelle Schultz, against Ruth, Rob, represented by Jon B Coats Jr, Esq, in the jurisdiction of Pinellas County, FL, . Pinellas County, FL Superior Courts with COVERT, THANE presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 30, 2014 |
CategoryContracts And Indebtedness - Circuit |
Last RefreshedFebruary 20, 2021 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationPinellas County, FL |
Matter TypeGeneral Creditor |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 25, 2019 | Docket Event | ORDER GRANTING Doc # 62WITHDRAW AS COUNSEL | |
July 25, 2019 | Docket Event | ORDER GRANTING Doc # 61WITHDRAW AS COUNSEL | |
July 18, 2019 | Docket Event | ORDER GRANTING Doc # 60PLTFS TELEPHONIC APPEARANCE AT HEARING 072519 9:15 | |
July 16, 2019 | Docket Event | PLTF-PET'S MOTION Doc # 59FOR TELEPHONIC HEARING | |
July 15, 2019 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF HEARING Doc # 58072519 9:15 | |
July 10, 2019 | Docket Event | PLTF-PET'S MOTION TO WITHDRAW Doc # 57AS COUNSEL | |
July 10, 2019 | Docket Event | CASE REOPENED Doc # 56 | |
June 04, 2019 | Docket Event | FINAL JUDGMENT Doc # 55OF GARNISHMENT AS TO WINDHAVEN INSURANCE COMPANYVol./Book 20566, Page 449, 2 pages | |
June 04, 2019 | Docket Event | FINAL JUDGMENT Doc # 54OF GARNISHMENT AS TO ACHIEVA CREDIT UNIONVol./Book 20566, Page 405, 2 pages | |
June 04, 2019 | Docket Event | ATTORNEY COVER LETTER Doc # 53--- COURT RECEIVED 052819 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.