Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Portfolio Recovery Associates Llc, filed a(n) General Small Claims - Small Claims case represented by Chantel C Wonder, against Le, Hien, in the jurisdiction of Pinellas County, FL, . Pinellas County, FL Superior Courts with CARASSAS, JOHN presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 31, 2014 |
CategorySmall Claims 3 - $501 - $2,500 |
Last RefreshedSeptember 16, 2023 |
Practice AreaSmall Claims |
Filing LocationPinellas County, FL |
Matter TypeGeneral Small Claims |
This complaint is filed in the County Court in Pinellas County, Florida. The plaintiff, Portfolio Recovery Associates, LLC, is suing the defendant, Hien Le, for damages less than $5,000. The complaint states that the defendant obtained and used a rev...
EXHIBIT BILL OF SALE AND ASSIGNMENT
Date: December 31, 2014AFFIDAVIT
Date: December 31, 2014NOTICE TO PLTF-PLTF ATTY
Date: January 06, 2015SUMMONS-NOTICE EMAILED TO ATTY-PLTF FOR SERVICE Party: LE, HIEN
Date: January 06, 2015CIVIL COVER SHEET - E-FILED
Date: December 31, 2014NOTICE-STMT OF CLAIM-DEFT VIA ATTORNEY Party: LE, HIEN
Date: January 06, 2015COMPLAINT E-FILED
Date: December 31, 2014CANCELED SMALL CLAIMS PRE-TRIAL (1:00 PM) (Judicial Officer CARASSAS, JOHN) NON-SERVICE
Date: February 10, 2015AFFIDAVIT OF NON-SERVICE
Date: January 24, 2015SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED NOT USED BY CLERK
Date: December 31, 2014(NON RECORDED) NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE
Date: May 09, 2015EXHIBIT ACCOUNT SUMMARY
Date: December 31, 2014Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 09, 2015 | Docket Event |
(NON RECORDED) NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE
Judge: SMALL CLAIMS JUDGE, NORTH |
|
May 09, 2015 | Docket Event |
CASE DISMISSED - BEFORE HEARING (SRS DISPOSITION)
Judge: SMALL CLAIMS JUDGE, NORTH |
|
February 10, 2015 | Docket Event |
CANCELED SMALL CLAIMS PRE-TRIAL (1:00 PM) (Judicial Officer CARASSAS, JOHN) NON-SERVICE
Judge: SMALL CLAIMS JUDGE, NORTH |
|
January 24, 2015 | Docket Event |
AFFIDAVIT OF NON-SERVICE
Judge: SMALL CLAIMS JUDGE, NORTH |
|
January 06, 2015 | Docket Event |
NOTICE TO PLTF-PLTF ATTY
Judge: SMALL CLAIMS JUDGE, NORTH |
|
January 06, 2015 | Docket Event |
SUMMONS-NOTICE EMAILED TO ATTY-PLTF FOR SERVICE Party: LE, HIEN
Judge: SMALL CLAIMS JUDGE, NORTH |
|
January 06, 2015 | Docket Event |
NOTICE-STMT OF CLAIM-DEFT VIA ATTORNEY Party: LE, HIEN
Judge: SMALL CLAIMS JUDGE, NORTH |
|
December 31, 2014 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT BILL OF SALE AND ASSIGNMENT
Judge: SMALL CLAIMS JUDGE, NORTH |
|
December 31, 2014 | Docket Event |
AFFIDAVIT
Judge: SMALL CLAIMS JUDGE, NORTH |
|
December 31, 2014 | Docket Event |
CIVIL COVER SHEET - E-FILED
Judge: SMALL CLAIMS JUDGE, NORTH |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.