Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
U S Bank National Association, filed a(n) Foreclosure - Property case represented by Daniel Whitney, Esq, against Unknown Trustee Of Rag Irrv Trust Dated June 1, 2011 And Known As Trust No 05312011, Unknown Beneficiary Of Rag Irrv Trust Dated 060111, United States Of America Department Of The Treasury, Mortgage Electronic Registration Systems Inc, Madison, Helen, (total of 7) See All represented by Rod B Neuman, Esq, Kenneth H Keefe, Esq, in the jurisdiction of Pinellas County, FL, . Pinellas County, FL Superior Courts with MUSCARELLA, PATRICIA ANN presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 30, 2014 |
CategoryReal Prop - Homestead Res Foreclosure3 $250,000 Or More |
Last RefreshedFebruary 20, 2021 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationPinellas County, FL |
Matter TypeForeclosure |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 08, 2018 | Docket Event | CANCELED JUDICIAL ONLINE SALE (10:00 AM) (Judicial Officer ONLINE SALE, JUDICIAL) ORDER FROM COURTPER JUDGE MUSCARELLA | |
January 26, 2018 | Docket Event | RETURNED ORIGINAL LOAN DOCUMENTS Doc # 22 | |
January 26, 2018 | Docket Event | ORDER VACATING Doc # 21FINAL JDMT/CANCEL SALE FOR 020818/REL LIS PENDENS/DISMISS ACTION/RTN ORIGINAL DOCSVol./Book 19921, Page 1734, 3 pages | |
January 26, 2018 | Docket Event | ATTORNEY COVER LETTER Doc # 20RCVD BY COURT 012518 | |
January 24, 2018 | Docket Event | FINAL DISPOSITION FORM Doc # 18 | |
January 24, 2018 | Docket Event | CASE REOPENED | |
January 24, 2018 | Docket Event | PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO CANCEL FORECLOSURE SALE Doc # 19/DISMISS ACTION/DISCHARGE LIS PENDENS/VACATE JUDGMENT AND RETURN ORIGINAL NOTE | |
January 12, 2018 | Docket Event | PUBLISHER'S AFFIDAVIT NOTICE OF SALE Doc # 17 | |
December 22, 2017 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF SALE Doc # 16ESF PAID | |
December 14, 2017 | Docket Event | CANCELED JUDICIAL ONLINE SALE (10:00 AM) (Judicial Officer ONLINE SALE, JUDICIAL) ORDER FROM COURTCANCELLED PER COURT ORDER |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.