Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Portfolio Recovery Associates Llc, filed a(n) General Small Claims - Small Claims case represented by Chantel C Wonder, against Ferrell, Kisha, in the jurisdiction of Pinellas County, FL, . Pinellas County, FL Superior Courts with JAGGER, EDWIN presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 31, 2014 |
CategorySmall Claims 3 - $501 - $2,500 |
Last RefreshedSeptember 15, 2023 |
Practice AreaSmall Claims |
Filing LocationPinellas County, FL |
Matter TypeGeneral Small Claims |
This complaint is filed by Portfolio Recovery Associates, LLC against Kisha Ferrell in the County Court of Pinellas County, Florida. The plaintiff is seeking damages less than $5,000. The complaint states that the defendant obtained and used a GE Cap...
NOTICE TO PLTF-PLTF ATTY
Date: January 06, 2015AFFIDAVIT
Date: December 31, 2014NOTICE-STMT OF CLAIM-DEFT VIA ATTORNEY Party: FERRELL, KISHA
Date: January 06, 2015SUMMONS-NOTICE EMAILED TO ATTY-PLTF FOR SERVICE Party: FERRELL, KISHA
Date: January 06, 2015SMALL CLAIMS PRE TRIAL ICD (10:30 AM) (Judicial Officer JAGGER, EDWIN) Result: SC HEARING HELD
Date: February 19, 2015COMPLAINT E-FILED
Date: December 31, 2014EXHIBIT ACCOUNT SUMMARY
Date: December 31, 2014SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED
Date: December 31, 2014SUGGESTION OF BANKRUPTCY AS TO KISHA L WILKINSON
Date: February 06, 2015EXHIBIT BILL OF SALE
Date: December 31, 2014AFFIDAVIT-SERVICE OF PROCESS
Date: January 24, 2015(NON RECORDED) NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE
Date: March 05, 2015Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 05, 2015 | Docket Event |
(NON RECORDED) NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE
Judge: JAGGER, EDWIN |
|
March 05, 2015 | Docket Event |
CASE DISMISSED - AFTER HEARING (SRS DISPOSITION)
Judge: JAGGER, EDWIN |
|
February 19, 2015 | Docket Event |
SMALL CLAIMS PRE TRIAL ICD (10:30 AM) (Judicial Officer JAGGER, EDWIN) Result: SC HEARING HELD
Judge: JAGGER, EDWIN |
|
February 19, 2015 | Docket Event |
PRE-TRIAL CONTINUED PENDING BANKRUPTCY
Judge: JAGGER, EDWIN |
|
February 06, 2015 | Docket Event |
SUGGESTION OF BANKRUPTCY AS TO KISHA L WILKINSON
Judge: JAGGER, EDWIN |
|
January 24, 2015 | Docket Event |
AFFIDAVIT-SERVICE OF PROCESS
Judge: JAGGER, EDWIN |
|
January 06, 2015 | Docket Event |
NOTICE TO PLTF-PLTF ATTY
Judge: JAGGER, EDWIN |
|
January 06, 2015 | Docket Event |
NOTICE-STMT OF CLAIM-DEFT VIA ATTORNEY Party: FERRELL, KISHA
Judge: JAGGER, EDWIN |
|
January 06, 2015 | Docket Event |
SUMMONS-NOTICE EMAILED TO ATTY-PLTF FOR SERVICE Party: FERRELL, KISHA
Judge: JAGGER, EDWIN |
|
December 31, 2014 | Docket Event |
AFFIDAVIT
Judge: JAGGER, EDWIN |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.