Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Maids Maintenance And More Inc, filed a(n) General Small Claims - Small Claims case represented by George K Rahdert, against Hofacker And Associates Inc, in the jurisdiction of Pinellas County, FL, . Pinellas County, FL Superior Courts with JAGGER, EDWIN presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 31, 2014 |
CategorySmall Claims 4 - $2,501 - $5,000 |
Last RefreshedSeptember 16, 2023 |
Practice AreaSmall Claims |
Filing LocationPinellas County, FL |
Matter TypeGeneral Small Claims |
This complaint is a civil action for damages filed by MAIDS, MAINTENANCE & MORE, INC. against HOFACKER & ASSOCIATES, INC. The damages being claimed do not exceed $5,000. MAIDS, MAINTENANCE & MORE, INC. is a Florida corporation located in Pinellas Cou...
STIPULATION-ORDER APPROVING PAYMENT Vol./Book 18690, Page 969, 1 pages
Date: February 19, 2015SUMMONS-NOTICE EMAILED TO ATTY-PLTF FOR SERVICE Party: HOFACKER AND ASSOCIATES INC
Date: January 06, 2015SUMMONS - SERVED 010915 HOFACKER AND ASSOCIATES, INC
Date: January 27, 2015NOTICE TO PLTF-PLTF ATTY
Date: January 06, 2015COMPLAINT E-FILED
Date: December 31, 2014NOTICE-STMT OF CLAIM-DEFT VIA ATTORNEY Party: HOFACKER AND ASSOCIATES INC
Date: January 06, 2015SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED NOT USED BY CLERK
Date: December 31, 2014SMALL CLAIMS PRE TRIAL ICD (10:30 AM) (Judicial Officer JAGGER, EDWIN) Result: SC HEARING HELD
Date: February 19, 2015Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 19, 2015 | Docket Event |
STIPULATION-ORDER APPROVING PAYMENT Vol./Book 18690, Page 969, 1 pages
Judge: JAGGER, EDWIN |
|
February 19, 2015 | Docket Event |
SMALL CLAIMS PRE TRIAL ICD (10:30 AM) (Judicial Officer JAGGER, EDWIN) Result: SC HEARING HELD
Judge: JAGGER, EDWIN |
|
February 19, 2015 | Docket Event |
REFERRAL TO MEDIATION FROM SC PRETRIAL
Judge: JAGGER, EDWIN |
|
February 05, 2015 | Docket Event |
PLTF-PET'S MOTION FOR DEFAULT DEFAULT NOT ENTERED-SUMMON WERE FOR NOTICE TO APPEAR-NOT TO FILE A RESPONSE
Judge: JAGGER, EDWIN |
|
January 27, 2015 | Docket Event |
SUMMONS - SERVED 010915 HOFACKER AND ASSOCIATES, INC
Judge: JAGGER, EDWIN |
|
January 06, 2015 | Docket Event |
SUMMONS-NOTICE EMAILED TO ATTY-PLTF FOR SERVICE Party: HOFACKER AND ASSOCIATES INC
Judge: JAGGER, EDWIN |
|
January 06, 2015 | Docket Event |
NOTICE TO PLTF-PLTF ATTY
Judge: JAGGER, EDWIN |
|
January 06, 2015 | Docket Event |
NOTICE-STMT OF CLAIM-DEFT VIA ATTORNEY Party: HOFACKER AND ASSOCIATES INC
Judge: JAGGER, EDWIN |
|
December 31, 2014 | Docket Event |
COMPLAINT E-FILED
Judge: JAGGER, EDWIN |
|
December 31, 2014 | Docket Event |
SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED NOT USED BY CLERK
Judge: JAGGER, EDWIN |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.