Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Bank Of New York Mellon, filed a(n) Foreclosure - Property case represented by Shelly Schellenberg, against Jenkins, Felicia, Metroplex Investments Inc, in the jurisdiction of Pinellas County, FL, . Pinellas County, FL Superior Courts with MINKOFF, THOMAS H presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeMINKOFF, THOMAS H Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 31, 2014 |
CategoryReal Prop - Homestead Res Foreclosure2 $50,001 - $249,999 |
Last RefreshedFebruary 20, 2021 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationPinellas County, FL |
Matter TypeForeclosure |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 23, 2018 | Docket Event | CORRESPONDENCE FROM CLERK RE Doc # 2ATTY LETTER FILED 042318 | |
April 23, 2018 | Docket Event | ATTORNEY COVER LETTER Doc # 1REFERENCE ORDER VACATING ON DOCKET 10/11/6 | |
October 13, 2016 | Docket Event | RETURNED ORIGINAL LOAN DOCUMENTS | |
October 11, 2016 | Docket Event | CORRESPONDENCE TO COURT REMTN FOR ORDER VACATING FINAL JUDGMENT RECEIVED BY COURT 100416 | |
October 11, 2016 | Docket Event | ORDER VACATINGFINAL JUDGMENT/VACATING SALE / VACATING CERTIFICATE OF SALE/VACATING CERTIFICATE OF TITLE/DISMISSING ACTION AND RETURN ORIGINAL DOCUMENTSVol./Book 19374, Page 1561, 2 pages | |
September 28, 2016 | Docket Event | PLTF-PET'S MOTIONFOR ORDER VACATING FINAL JUDGMENT/SALE/CERTIFICATE OF SALE/CERTIFICATE OF TITLE/DISMSSING/RETURN DOCUMENTS | |
September 28, 2016 | Docket Event | CASE REOPENED | |
July 25, 2016 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF HEARING083016 11:30 | |
April 22, 2016 | Docket Event | RETURNED FROM POST OFFICECOPY OF CERTIFICATE/COPY OF NOTICE | |
April 20, 2016 | Docket Event | CERTIFICATE OF TITLEVol./Book 19162, Page 1713, 2 pages |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.