Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Klein, Tracy Joanne, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case against Klein, Joseph Wesley, in the jurisdiction of Pinellas County, FL, . Pinellas County, FL Superior Courts with WILLIAMS, AMY M presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 31, 2014 |
CategoryDissolution Of Marriage - No Children |
Last RefreshedDecember 31, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationPinellas County, FL |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 03, 2017 | Docket Event |
FINDINGS-ORDER OF COURT RE TEMPORALLY ABATE ALIMONY
Judge: WILLIAMS, AMY M |
|
February 06, 2017 | Docket Event |
ORDER SCHEDULING NON-JURY TRIAL 033017 9:30
Judge: WILLIAMS, AMY M |
|
February 06, 2017 | Docket Event |
ORDER OF REFERENCE TO GENERAL MAGISTRATE
Judge: WILLIAMS, AMY M |
|
January 03, 2017 | Docket Event |
CONTESTED ANSWER TO SUPPLEMENTAL PETITION PRO SE Party: KLEIN, TRACY JOANNE
Judge: WILLIAMS, AMY M |
|
January 03, 2017 | Docket Event |
PETITIONER'S FINANCIAL STATEMENT-AFFIDAVIT
Judge: WILLIAMS, AMY M |
|
December 19, 2016 | Docket Event |
SUMMONS - SERVED 121216 Party: KLEIN, TRACY JOANNE
Judge: WILLIAMS, AMY M |
|
November 10, 2016 | Docket Event |
RESPONDENT'S FINANCIAL STATEMENT-AFFIDAVIT
Judge: WILLIAMS, AMY M |
|
November 10, 2016 | Docket Event |
SUPPLEMENTAL PETITION FOR MODIFICATION OF ALIMONY
Judge: WILLIAMS, AMY M |
|
November 10, 2016 | Docket Event |
SUMMONS ISSUED AT COUNTER FOR SERVICE IN OREGON Party: KLEIN, TRACY JOANNE
Judge: WILLIAMS, AMY M |
|
March 04, 2015 | Docket Event |
CERTIFIED STATEMENT COMPLETED BY CLERK
Judge: WILLIAMS, AMY M |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.