Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Martinez, Rolando, filed a(n) Paternity - Family case against Rodriguez, Nancy Lizbeth, Hurtado, Jose De Jesus Mosqueda, in the jurisdiction of Pinellas County, FL, . Pinellas County, FL Superior Courts with MUSCARELLA, PATRICIA ANN presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 30, 2014 |
CategoryPaternity - Non Ivd |
Last RefreshedJanuary 05, 2022 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationPinellas County, FL |
Matter TypePaternity |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 30, 2015 | Docket Event |
CERTIFIED COPY FINAL JUDGMENT TO OVS W/O CHECK
Judge: MUSCARELLA, PATRICIA ANN |
|
June 19, 2015 | Docket Event |
FINAL DISPOSITION FORM
Judge: MUSCARELLA, PATRICIA ANN |
|
June 19, 2015 | Docket Event |
JUDGMENT (SRS)
Judge: MUSCARELLA, PATRICIA ANN |
|
June 19, 2015 | Docket Event |
FINAL JUDGMENT PATERNITY Vol./Book 18827, Page 759, 2 pages
Judge: MUSCARELLA, PATRICIA ANN |
|
April 14, 2015 | Docket Event |
NOTICE SETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE OR FINAL HEARING 051515 10:30
Judge: MUSCARELLA, PATRICIA ANN |
|
April 14, 2015 | Docket Event |
ORDER TO BRING/ FILE DOCUMENTS TO CASE MGMT CONFERENCE
Judge: MUSCARELLA, PATRICIA ANN |
|
March 31, 2015 | Docket Event |
CERTIFICATE OF COMPLETION - PETITIONER
Judge: MUSCARELLA, PATRICIA ANN |
|
March 31, 2015 | Docket Event |
ACKNOWLEDGEMENT OF PATERNITY
Judge: MUSCARELLA, PATRICIA ANN |
|
March 31, 2015 | Docket Event |
CERTIFICATE OF COMPLETION - RESPONDENT
Judge: MUSCARELLA, PATRICIA ANN |
|
December 30, 2014 | Docket Event |
AFFIDAVIT-DECLARATION UNIFORM CHILD CUSTODY
Judge: MUSCARELLA, PATRICIA ANN |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.