Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Carnal, Gina P, filed a(n) General Criminal - Criminal case against Brown, Ryan Breon, in the jurisdiction of Pinellas County, FL, . Pinellas County, FL Superior Courts with SCHAEFER, JOHN A presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 30, 2014 |
CategoryDomestic - Dating Violence |
Last RefreshedJanuary 02, 2022 |
Practice AreaCriminal |
Filing LocationPinellas County, FL |
Matter TypeGeneral Criminal |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 21, 2015 | Docket Event |
RETURNED FROM POST OFFICE ORDER OF DISMISSAL
Judge: SCHAEFER, JOHN A |
|
January 13, 2015 | Docket Event |
AFFIDAVIT-SERVICE OF PROCESS INJUNCTION Party: BROWN, RYAN BREON
Judge: SCHAEFER, JOHN A |
|
January 12, 2015 | Docket Event |
FINAL DISPOSITION FORM
Judge: SCHAEFER, JOHN A |
|
January 09, 2015 | Docket Event |
ORDER OF DISMISSAL OF INJUNCTION Vol./Book 18648, Page 383, 1 pages
Judge: SCHAEFER, JOHN A |
|
January 08, 2015 | Docket Event |
DOMESTIC INJUNCTION - DATING VIOLENCE (10:30 AM) (Judicial Officer MUSCARELLA, PATRICIA ANN)
Judge: SCHAEFER, JOHN A |
|
December 30, 2014 | Docket Event |
CC PETITION WITH ATTACHMENTS TO SHF
Judge: SCHAEFER, JOHN A |
|
December 30, 2014 | Docket Event |
NON-WAIVER OF RETURN HEARING
Judge: SCHAEFER, JOHN A |
|
December 30, 2014 | Docket Event |
PETITION (SRS)
Judge: SCHAEFER, JOHN A |
|
December 30, 2014 | Docket Event |
CIVIL COVER SHEET
Judge: SCHAEFER, JOHN A |
|
December 30, 2014 | Docket Event |
CLERK'S INFORMATION SHEET
Judge: SCHAEFER, JOHN A |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.