Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Terrier Properties Llc, filed a(n) Landlord-Tenant - Property case represented by Lisa R Wilcox, Esq, against Clark, Charese, in the jurisdiction of Pinellas County, FL, . Pinellas County, FL Superior Courts with HESSINGER, KATHLEEN T presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 31, 2014 |
CategoryDelinquent Tenant - County |
Last RefreshedSeptember 16, 2023 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationPinellas County, FL |
Matter TypeLandlord-Tenant |
This complaint is a legal document filed by Terrier Properties, LLC against Charese Clark in the County Court of Pinellas County, Florida. The purpose of the complaint is to evict Charese Clark from a property located at 1023 Locust Street NE, Unit 0...
PLTF-PET'S MOTION FOR DEFAULT NOT PROCESSED BY CLERK - NEED CERTIFICATE OF MAILING PACKET
Date: January 21, 2015AFFIDAVIT AS TO MILITARY SERVICE
Date: January 20, 2015PLTF-PET'S MOTION FOR DEFAULT NOT PROCESSED BY CLERK - NEED CERTIFICATE OF MAILING
Date: January 20, 2015AFFIDAVIT AS TO COSTS DAMAGES
Date: January 20, 2015COMPLAINT
Date: December 31, 2014EXHIBIT THREE DAY NOTICE
Date: December 31, 2014CIVIL COVER SHEET - E-FILED
Date: December 31, 2014MASTER ORDER OF DISMISSAL CLARK, CHARESE Vol./Book 19120, Page 1462, 3 pages
Date: March 08, 2016SUMMONS SERVED - POSTED 011015 AS TO CHARESE CLARK
Date: January 20, 2015SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED ISSUED ON 12312014
Date: December 31, 2014NOTICE OF LACK OF PROSECUTION RETD BY P.O. UNKNOWN ADDRESS FOR DEFT CHARESE CLARK
Date: January 19, 2016Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 08, 2016 | Docket Event |
MASTER ORDER OF DISMISSAL CLARK, CHARESE Vol./Book 19120, Page 1462, 3 pages
Judge: HESSINGER, KATHLEEN T |
|
March 08, 2016 | Docket Event |
CASE DISMISSED - BEFORE HEARING (SRS DISPOSITION)
Judge: HESSINGER, KATHLEEN T |
|
March 08, 2016 | Docket Event |
DISMISSAL DATE FOR LACK OF PROSECUTION (12:00 AM) (Judicial Officer HESSINGER, KATHLEEN T)
Judge: HESSINGER, KATHLEEN T |
|
January 19, 2016 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF LACK OF PROSECUTION RETD BY P.O. UNKNOWN ADDRESS FOR DEFT CHARESE CLARK
Judge: HESSINGER, KATHLEEN T |
|
January 06, 2016 | Docket Event |
NOTICE-LACK OF PROSECUTION MAILED TO ALL PARTIES
Judge: HESSINGER, KATHLEEN T |
|
January 21, 2015 | Docket Event |
PLTF-PET'S MOTION FOR DEFAULT NOT PROCESSED BY CLERK - NEED CERTIFICATE OF MAILING PACKET
Judge: HESSINGER, KATHLEEN T |
|
January 20, 2015 | Docket Event |
AFFIDAVIT AS TO MILITARY SERVICE
Judge: HESSINGER, KATHLEEN T |
|
January 20, 2015 | Docket Event |
PLTF-PET'S MOTION FOR DEFAULT NOT PROCESSED BY CLERK - NEED CERTIFICATE OF MAILING
Judge: HESSINGER, KATHLEEN T |
|
January 20, 2015 | Docket Event |
AFFIDAVIT AS TO COSTS DAMAGES
Judge: HESSINGER, KATHLEEN T |
|
January 20, 2015 | Docket Event |
SUMMONS SERVED - POSTED 011015 AS TO CHARESE CLARK
Judge: HESSINGER, KATHLEEN T |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.