Case Last Refreshed: 4 months ago
Property Terr 72 Llc, filed a(n) Landlord-Tenant - Property case represented by Brian P Wolk, Esq, against Miller, Roxane, Miller, Scott, in the jurisdiction of Pinellas County, FL, . Pinellas County, FL Superior Courts with McNARY, MYRA SCOTT presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 31, 2014 |
CategoryDelinquent Tenant - County |
Last RefreshedDecember 18, 2023 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationPinellas County, FL |
Matter TypeLandlord-Tenant |
This complaint is a tenant eviction case filed by Property Terr 72 LLC against Roxane Miller and Scott Miller in the County Court of Pinellas County, Florida. The plaintiff alleges that the defendants failed to pay the full rent when due and all subs...
FINAL JUDGMENT- COUNT 1 POSSESSION Vol./Book 18655, Page 1145, 1 pages
Date: January 21, 2015CERTIFICATE OF MAILING Party: MILLER, ROXANE Party: MILLER, SCOTT
Date: January 05, 2015LIST OF EXHIBITS RESIDENTIAL RENTAL AGREEMENT
Date: December 31, 2014VERIFICATION OF CLAIM AND NON-MILITARY SERVICE
Date: January 06, 2015SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED ISSUED ON 123114
Date: December 31, 2014CIVIL COVER SHEET - E-FILED
Date: December 31, 2014DESIGNATION OF E-MAIL ADDRESS(ES)
Date: December 31, 2014LIST OF EXHIBITS THREE DAY NOTICE
Date: December 31, 2014COMPLAINT
Date: December 31, 2014SUMMONS - SERVED 010615 SCOTT MILLER
Date: January 09, 2015SUMMONS - SERVED 010615 ROXANE MILLER
Date: January 09, 2015DEFAULT ENTERED Party: MILLER, ROXANE Party: MILLER, SCOTT
Date: January 14, 2015PLTF-PET'S MOTION FOR FINAL JUDGMENT
Date: January 14, 2015PLTF-PET'S MOTION FOR DEFAULT - DEFAULT ENTERED 011415
Date: January 14, 2015WRIT OF POSSESSION ISSUED TO ATTY 1/23/15
Date: January 23, 2015WRIT OF POSSESSION EXECUTED
Date: February 02, 2015Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 02, 2015 | Docket Event |
WRIT OF POSSESSION EXECUTED
Judge: McNARY, MYRA SCOTT |
|
January 23, 2015 | Docket Event |
WRIT OF POSSESSION ISSUED TO ATTY 1/23/15
Judge: McNARY, MYRA SCOTT |
|
January 21, 2015 | Docket Event |
FINAL JUDGMENT- COUNT 1 POSSESSION Vol./Book 18655, Page 1145, 1 pages
Judge: McNARY, MYRA SCOTT |
|
January 21, 2015 | Docket Event |
DEFAULT JUDGMENT (SRS DISPO)
Judge: McNARY, MYRA SCOTT |
|
January 14, 2015 | Docket Event |
DEFAULT ENTERED Party: MILLER, ROXANE Party: MILLER, SCOTT
Judge: McNARY, MYRA SCOTT |
|
January 14, 2015 | Docket Event |
PLTF-PET'S MOTION FOR FINAL JUDGMENT
Judge: McNARY, MYRA SCOTT |
|
January 14, 2015 | Docket Event |
PLTF-PET'S MOTION FOR DEFAULT - DEFAULT ENTERED 011415
Judge: McNARY, MYRA SCOTT |
|
January 09, 2015 | Docket Event |
SUMMONS - SERVED 010615 SCOTT MILLER
Judge: McNARY, MYRA SCOTT |
|
January 09, 2015 | Docket Event |
SUMMONS - SERVED 010615 ROXANE MILLER
Judge: McNARY, MYRA SCOTT |
|
January 06, 2015 | Docket Event |
VERIFICATION OF CLAIM AND NON-MILITARY SERVICE
Judge: McNARY, MYRA SCOTT |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.