Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Oculus Mondo Llc, filed a(n) Landlord-Tenant - Property case against Clayton, Frederic, Jr, in the jurisdiction of Pinellas County, FL, . Pinellas County, FL Superior Courts with HESSINGER, KATHLEEN T presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 30, 2014 |
CategoryDelinquent Tenant - County |
Last RefreshedJuly 15, 2022 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationPinellas County, FL |
Matter TypeLandlord-Tenant |
CIVIL COVER SHEET
Date: December 30, 2014PLTF-PET'S MOTION FOR COURT DEFAULT
Date: January 09, 2015FINAL JUDGMENT- COUNT 1 POSSESSION Vol./Book 18649, Page 966, 1 pages
Date: January 13, 2015SUMMONS - SERVED 12/30/2014 Party: CLAYTON, FREDERIC, JR
Date: January 06, 2015AFFIDAVIT AS TO MILITARY SERVICE
Date: January 09, 2015EXHIBIT LEASE AGREEMENT
Date: December 30, 2014COMPLAINT COUNT TWO
Date: December 30, 2014EXHIBIT THREE DAY NOTICE
Date: December 30, 2014DEFAULT ENTERED BY COURT Party: CLAYTON, FREDERIC, JR
Date: January 13, 2015WRIT OF POSSESSION RETD EXECUTED
Date: January 22, 2015FINAL DISPOSITION FORM
Date: January 14, 2015WRIT OF POSSESSION ISSUED TO PLTF OTC
Date: January 14, 2015PLTF-PET'S MOTION FOR FINAL JUDGMENT (DEFAULT) COUNT I PRO SE
Date: January 09, 2015CERTIFICATE OF MAILING Party: CLAYTON, FREDERIC, JR
Date: December 30, 2014ANSWER OF Party: CLAYTON, FREDERIC, JR
Date: January 07, 2015CERTIFICATE OF MAILING Party: OCULUS MONDO LLC
Date: January 08, 2015Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 22, 2015 | Docket Event |
WRIT OF POSSESSION RETD EXECUTED
Judge: HESSINGER, KATHLEEN T |
|
January 14, 2015 | Docket Event |
FINAL DISPOSITION FORM
Judge: HESSINGER, KATHLEEN T |
|
January 14, 2015 | Docket Event |
WRIT OF POSSESSION ISSUED TO PLTF OTC
Judge: HESSINGER, KATHLEEN T |
|
January 13, 2015 | Docket Event |
FINAL JUDGMENT- COUNT 1 POSSESSION Vol./Book 18649, Page 966, 1 pages
Judge: HESSINGER, KATHLEEN T |
|
January 13, 2015 | Docket Event |
DEFAULT ENTERED BY COURT Party: CLAYTON, FREDERIC, JR
Judge: HESSINGER, KATHLEEN T |
|
January 13, 2015 | Docket Event |
DEFAULT JUDGMENT (SRS DISPO)
Judge: HESSINGER, KATHLEEN T |
|
January 12, 2015 | Docket Event |
UNSIGNED ORDER SENT TO JUDGE COURT DEFAULT, FJ W/ENVS
Judge: HESSINGER, KATHLEEN T |
|
January 09, 2015 | Docket Event |
PLTF-PET'S MOTION FOR COURT DEFAULT
Judge: HESSINGER, KATHLEEN T |
|
January 09, 2015 | Docket Event |
AFFIDAVIT AS TO MILITARY SERVICE
Judge: HESSINGER, KATHLEEN T |
|
January 09, 2015 | Docket Event |
PLTF-PET'S MOTION FOR FINAL JUDGMENT (DEFAULT) COUNT I PRO SE
Judge: HESSINGER, KATHLEEN T |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.