Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Liptak, Kurt, filed a(n) General Small Claims - Small Claims case against Lakemont Ridge Home And Rv, in the jurisdiction of Pinellas County, FL, . Pinellas County, FL Superior Courts with CARASSAS, JOHN presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 31, 2014 |
CategorySmall Claims 3 - $501 - $2,500 |
Last RefreshedOctober 27, 2022 |
Practice AreaSmall Claims |
Filing LocationPinellas County, FL |
Matter TypeGeneral Small Claims |
NOTICE TO PLTF-PLTF ATTY
Date: January 06, 2015ATTACHMENT TO COMPLAINT INVOICE
Date: December 31, 2014STATEMENT OF CLAIM
Date: December 31, 2014CERTIFIED MAIL RECEIPT-TRACKING SLIP
Date: January 06, 2015NOTICE-STMT OF CLAIM-DEFT VIA CERTIFIED MAIL Party: LAKEMONT RIDGE HOME AND RV
Date: January 06, 2015CERTIFIED MAIL RECEIPT RETURNED
Date: January 09, 2015NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL
Date: February 04, 2015CANCELED SMALL CLAIMS PRE-TRIAL (10:30 AM) (Judicial Officer CARASSAS, JOHN) SETTLED
Date: February 10, 2015Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 10, 2015 | Docket Event |
CANCELED SMALL CLAIMS PRE-TRIAL (10:30 AM) (Judicial Officer CARASSAS, JOHN) SETTLED
Judge: SMALL CLAIMS JUDGE, NORTH |
|
February 04, 2015 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL
Judge: SMALL CLAIMS JUDGE, NORTH |
|
January 09, 2015 | Docket Event |
CERTIFIED MAIL RECEIPT RETURNED
Judge: SMALL CLAIMS JUDGE, NORTH |
|
January 06, 2015 | Docket Event |
NOTICE TO PLTF-PLTF ATTY
Judge: SMALL CLAIMS JUDGE, NORTH |
|
January 06, 2015 | Docket Event |
CERTIFIED MAIL RECEIPT-TRACKING SLIP
Judge: SMALL CLAIMS JUDGE, NORTH |
|
January 06, 2015 | Docket Event |
NOTICE-STMT OF CLAIM-DEFT VIA CERTIFIED MAIL Party: LAKEMONT RIDGE HOME AND RV
Judge: SMALL CLAIMS JUDGE, NORTH |
|
December 31, 2014 | Docket Event |
ATTACHMENT TO COMPLAINT INVOICE
Judge: SMALL CLAIMS JUDGE, NORTH |
|
December 31, 2014 | Docket Event |
STATEMENT OF CLAIM
Judge: SMALL CLAIMS JUDGE, NORTH |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.