Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Galencare Of Florida Inc, filed a(n) General Small Claims - Small Claims case represented by Joseph F Rosen, Esq, against Williams, Melinda S, in the jurisdiction of Pinellas County, FL, . Pinellas County, FL Superior Courts with CARASSAS, JOHN presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 31, 2014 |
CategorySmall Claims 4 - $2,501 - $5,000 |
Last RefreshedNovember 07, 2022 |
Practice AreaSmall Claims |
Filing LocationPinellas County, FL |
Matter TypeGeneral Small Claims |
NOTICE OF CONFIDENTIAL INFORMATION WITHIN COURT FILE
Date: December 31, 2014NOTICE-STMT OF CLAIM-DEFT Party: WILLIAMS, MELINDA S
Date: January 05, 2015SUMMONS-NOTICE EMAILED TO ATTY-PLTF FOR SERVICE Party: WILLIAMS, MELINDA S
Date: January 05, 2015DESIGNATION OF E-MAIL ADDRESS(ES)
Date: December 31, 2014NOTICE TO PLTF-PLTF ATTY
Date: January 05, 2015STATEMENT OF CLAIM - E-FILED
Date: December 31, 2014SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED
Date: December 31, 2014AFFIDAVIT OF NON-SERVICE
Date: February 09, 2015SMALL CLAIMS PRE TRIAL ICD (10:30 AM) (Judicial Officer CARASSAS, JOHN) Result: SC HEARING HELD
Date: February 10, 2015(NON RECORDED) NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL
Date: October 06, 2015Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 27, 2015 | Docket Event |
CANCELED DISMISSAL-FAILURE TO PROSECUTE-SC (12:00 AM) (Judicial Officer CARASSAS, JOHN) CASE DISMISSED
Judge: SMALL CLAIMS JUDGE, NORTH |
|
October 06, 2015 | Docket Event |
(NON RECORDED) NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL
Judge: SMALL CLAIMS JUDGE, NORTH |
|
October 06, 2015 | Docket Event |
CASE DISMISSED - AFTER HEARING (SRS DISPOSITION)
Judge: SMALL CLAIMS JUDGE, NORTH |
|
September 25, 2015 | Docket Event |
NOTICE-LACK OF PROSECUTION MAILED TO ALL PARTIES
Judge: SMALL CLAIMS JUDGE, NORTH |
|
February 10, 2015 | Docket Event |
SMALL CLAIMS PRE TRIAL ICD (10:30 AM) (Judicial Officer CARASSAS, JOHN) Result: SC HEARING HELD
Judge: SMALL CLAIMS JUDGE, NORTH |
|
February 10, 2015 | Docket Event |
PRE-TRIAL CONTINUED PEND SERVICE
Judge: SMALL CLAIMS JUDGE, NORTH |
|
February 09, 2015 | Docket Event |
AFFIDAVIT OF NON-SERVICE
Judge: SMALL CLAIMS JUDGE, NORTH |
|
January 05, 2015 | Docket Event |
NOTICE-STMT OF CLAIM-DEFT Party: WILLIAMS, MELINDA S
Judge: SMALL CLAIMS JUDGE, NORTH |
|
January 05, 2015 | Docket Event |
SUMMONS-NOTICE EMAILED TO ATTY-PLTF FOR SERVICE Party: WILLIAMS, MELINDA S
Judge: SMALL CLAIMS JUDGE, NORTH |
|
January 05, 2015 | Docket Event |
NOTICE TO PLTF-PLTF ATTY
Judge: SMALL CLAIMS JUDGE, NORTH |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.