Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Florida Department Of Revenue, Abrams, Amber Christine, filed a(n) General Adminstrative - Administrative case against Williams, Allan Christopher, in the jurisdiction of Pinellas County, FL, . Pinellas County, FL Superior Courts with JACK, ELIZABETH presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateSeptember 30, 2014 |
CategoryIv-D Administrative Support |
Last RefreshedFebruary 08, 2022 |
Practice AreaAdministrative |
Filing LocationPinellas County, FL |
Matter TypeGeneral Adminstrative |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 09, 2021 | Docket Event |
ORDER TO RECLOSE NO ACTIVITY Doc # 3
Judge: JACK, ELIZABETH |
|
September 23, 2021 | Docket Event |
MOTION (12:00 AM) (Judicial Officer JACK, ELIZABETH)
Judge: JACK, ELIZABETH |
|
April 19, 2019 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS OF PLAINTIFF Doc # 2 REJECT/DUPLICATE
Judge: JACK, ELIZABETH |
|
April 18, 2019 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS OF PLAINTIFF Doc # 1
Judge: JACK, ELIZABETH |
|
August 24, 2016 | Docket Event |
CERTIFICATE OF MAILING Party: FLORIDA DEPARTMENT OF REVENUE
Judge: JACK, ELIZABETH |
|
August 24, 2016 | Docket Event |
CERTIFICATE OF MAILING Party: WILLIAMS, ALLAN CHRISTOPHER
Judge: JACK, ELIZABETH |
|
August 22, 2016 | Docket Event |
MOTION FOR CONTEMPT PRO SE Party: ABRAMS, AMBER CHRISTINE
Judge: JACK, ELIZABETH |
|
August 22, 2016 | Docket Event |
REOPEN CASE CIVIL CONTEMPT- ENFORCEMENT
Judge: JACK, ELIZABETH |
|
November 12, 2015 | Docket Event |
JUDGMENT BY OPERATION OF LAW Vol./Book 18987, Page 117, 1 pages
Judge: JACK, ELIZABETH |
|
November 05, 2015 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF OVERDUE SUPPORT PAYMENTS RETD BY PO
Judge: JACK, ELIZABETH |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.