Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Tamarind Bay Llc, filed a(n) Landlord-Tenant - Property case represented by James I Barron, Iii, against Kolodzinski, Jennifer, in the jurisdiction of Pinellas County, FL, . Pinellas County, FL Superior Courts with JAGGER, EDWIN presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateSeptember 30, 2014 |
CategoryDelinquent Tenant - County |
Last RefreshedNovember 07, 2022 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationPinellas County, FL |
Matter TypeLandlord-Tenant |
ATTACHMENT TO COMPLAINT THREE DAY NOTICE
Date: September 30, 2014SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED ISSUED ON 9/30/14
Date: September 30, 2014INSTRUCTIONS TO CLERK
Date: September 30, 2014ATTACHMENT TO COMPLAINT LEASE
Date: September 30, 2014COMPLAINT
Date: September 30, 2014CIVIL COVER SHEET - E-FILED
Date: September 30, 2014CERTIFICATE OF MAILING Party: KOLODZINSKI, JENNIFER
Date: October 08, 2014DEFAULT ENTERED Party: KOLODZINSKI, JENNIFER
Date: October 22, 2014AFFIDAVIT AS TO MILITARY SERVICE
Date: October 22, 2014PLTF-PET'S MOTION FOR DEFAULT - DEFAULT ENTERED 102214
Date: October 22, 2014SUMMONS SERVED - POSTED 100714 AS TO JENNIFER KOLODZINSKI
Date: October 22, 2014WRIT OF POSSESSION ISSUED TO ATTY 10/24/14
Date: October 23, 2014FINAL JUDGMENT - COUNT I Vol./Book 18570, Page 404, 1 pages
Date: October 23, 2014WRIT OF POSSESSION EXECUTED
Date: November 03, 2014Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
November 03, 2014 | Docket Event |
WRIT OF POSSESSION EXECUTED
Judge: JAGGER, EDWIN |
|
October 23, 2014 | Docket Event |
WRIT OF POSSESSION ISSUED TO ATTY 10/24/14
Judge: JAGGER, EDWIN |
|
October 23, 2014 | Docket Event |
FINAL JUDGMENT - COUNT I Vol./Book 18570, Page 404, 1 pages
Judge: JAGGER, EDWIN |
|
October 23, 2014 | Docket Event |
DEFAULT JUDGMENT (SRS DISPO)
Judge: JAGGER, EDWIN |
|
October 22, 2014 | Docket Event |
DEFAULT ENTERED Party: KOLODZINSKI, JENNIFER
Judge: JAGGER, EDWIN |
|
October 22, 2014 | Docket Event |
AFFIDAVIT AS TO MILITARY SERVICE
Judge: JAGGER, EDWIN |
|
October 22, 2014 | Docket Event |
PLTF-PET'S MOTION FOR DEFAULT - DEFAULT ENTERED 102214
Judge: JAGGER, EDWIN |
|
October 22, 2014 | Docket Event |
SUMMONS SERVED - POSTED 100714 AS TO JENNIFER KOLODZINSKI
Judge: JAGGER, EDWIN |
|
October 08, 2014 | Docket Event |
CERTIFICATE OF MAILING Party: KOLODZINSKI, JENNIFER
Judge: JAGGER, EDWIN |
|
September 30, 2014 | Docket Event |
ATTACHMENT TO COMPLAINT THREE DAY NOTICE
Judge: JAGGER, EDWIN |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.