Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Solera Partners Llc, filed a(n) Landlord-Tenant - Property case represented by Brian P Wolk, Esq, against Carter, Tameika, in the jurisdiction of Pinellas County, FL, . Pinellas County, FL Superior Courts with JAGGER, EDWIN presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateSeptember 30, 2014 |
CategoryDelinquent Tenant - County |
Last RefreshedJuly 15, 2022 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationPinellas County, FL |
Matter TypeLandlord-Tenant |
WRIT OF POSSESSION EXECUTED
Date: October 29, 2014Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 29, 2014 | Docket Event |
WRIT OF POSSESSION EXECUTED
Judge: JAGGER, EDWIN |
|
October 21, 2014 | Docket Event |
WRIT OF POSSESSION ISSUED TO ATTY 10/22/14
Judge: JAGGER, EDWIN |
|
October 20, 2014 | Docket Event |
DEFAULT JUDGMENT (SRS DISPO)
Judge: JAGGER, EDWIN |
|
October 20, 2014 | Docket Event |
FINAL JUDGMENT - COUNT I Vol./Book 18565, Page 162, 1 pages
Judge: JAGGER, EDWIN |
|
October 15, 2014 | Docket Event |
DEFAULT ENTERED Party: CARTER, TAMEIKA
Judge: JAGGER, EDWIN |
|
October 13, 2014 | Docket Event |
PLTF-PET'S MOTION FOR FINAL JUDGMENT FOR POSSESSION
Judge: JAGGER, EDWIN |
|
October 13, 2014 | Docket Event |
PLTF-PET'S MOTION FOR DEFAULT DEFAULT ENTERED 101514
Judge: JAGGER, EDWIN |
|
October 07, 2014 | Docket Event |
VERIFICATION OF CLAIM AND NON-MILITARY SERVICE
Judge: JAGGER, EDWIN |
|
October 04, 2014 | Docket Event |
SUMMONS SERVED - POSTED TAMEIKA CARTER 100314
Judge: JAGGER, EDWIN |
|
October 02, 2014 | Docket Event |
CERTIFICATE OF MAILING Party: CARTER, TAMEIKA
Judge: JAGGER, EDWIN |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.