Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Us Bank National Association, filed a(n) Foreclosure - Property case represented by Allison Michele Meyer, against Any And All Unknown Parties, Capital One Bank Usa National Association, Jensen, Bruce J, Miller, Maxine A, Ortiz, Andrea N, (total of 7) See All represented by Ann M Shuh, Astrid Guardado, in the jurisdiction of Pinellas County, FL, . Pinellas County, FL Superior Courts with DAY, JACK presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateSeptember 30, 2014 |
CategoryReal Prop - Non-Homestead Res Foreclosure1 $0 - $50,000 |
Last RefreshedFebruary 20, 2021 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationPinellas County, FL |
Matter TypeForeclosure |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 27, 2016 | Docket Event | CERTIFICATE OF TITLEVol./Book 19065, Page 1259, 1 pages | |
January 27, 2016 | Docket Event | CERTIFICATE OF NO DISBURSEMENT | |
January 12, 2016 | Docket Event | CERTIFICATE OF SALEU S BANK NA | |
January 12, 2016 | Docket Event | JUDICIAL ONLINE SALE (10:00 AM) (Judicial Officer ONLINE SALE, JUDICIAL) REC VER | |
January 04, 2016 | Docket Event | PUBLISHER'S AFFIDAVIT NOTICE OF SALE | |
December 17, 2015 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF SALE | |
December 16, 2015 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF SALE | |
November 10, 2015 | Docket Event | UNIFORM FINAL JUDGMENT - BACKLOG PROJECT (SRS) | |
November 10, 2015 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF FILINGCERTIFICATION OF BUSINESS RECORDS/ ORIGINAL NOTE AND MORTGAGE | |
November 10, 2015 | Docket Event | FINAL JUDGMENT OF FORECLOSUREVol./Book 18988, Page 862, 7 pages |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.