Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Jpmorgan Chase Bank National Association, filed a(n) Foreclosure - Property case represented by Robert S Kahane, against Autumn Run-Beacon Run Homeowners Association Incorporated, Florida Consumer Law Center Pa, Gonzalez, Maria M, Unknown Persons N Possession, Unknown Spouse Of Maria M Gonzalez, (total of 5) See All represented by Charles Cadrecha, in the jurisdiction of Pinellas County, FL, . Pinellas County, FL Superior Courts with MINKOFF, THOMAS H presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateSeptember 30, 2014 |
CategoryReal Prop - Homestead Res Foreclosure2 $50,001 - $249,999 |
Last RefreshedFebruary 20, 2021 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationPinellas County, FL |
Matter TypeForeclosure |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 06, 2015 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSALW/ PREJ AND CANCEL LIS PENDENS | |
February 06, 2015 | Docket Event | CASE DISMISSED - BEFORE HEARING (SRS DISPOSITION) | |
February 06, 2015 | Docket Event | FINAL DISPOSITION FORM | |
December 05, 2014 | Docket Event | NOTICE BORROWER NONPART FORECLOSURE MEDIATIONAND CANCELLATION OF MEDIATION SET 121614 | |
November 05, 2014 | Docket Event | SUMMONS RETURNED NOT SERVEDUNKNOWN PERSONS IN POSSESSION OF THE SUBJECT PROPERTY | |
November 05, 2014 | Docket Event | SUMMONS - RETURNED SERVED100314 FLORIDA CONSUMER LAW CENTER. P.A | |
November 05, 2014 | Docket Event | SUMMONS - RETURNED SERVED100314 AUTUMN RUN-BEACON RUN HOMEOWNERS ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED | |
October 24, 2014 | Docket Event | ORDER REFERRAL FORECLOSURE MEDIATION | |
October 21, 2014 | Docket Event | ANSWER OFFLORIDA CONSUMER LAW CENTER | |
September 30, 2014 | Docket Event | ATTACHMENT TO COMPLAINTADJUSTABLE RATE NOTE |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.