Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Cach Llc, filed a(n) General Creditor - Creditor case represented by Bryan Manno, Esq, against Slonaker, Robert, represented by Douglas J Burns, in the jurisdiction of Pinellas County, FL, . Pinellas County, FL Superior Courts with CAMPBELL, PAMELA A.M. presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateSeptember 30, 2014 |
CategoryContracts And Indebtedness - Circuit |
Last RefreshedFebruary 20, 2021 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationPinellas County, FL |
Matter TypeGeneral Creditor |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 25, 2015 | Docket Event | CASE DISMISSED - BEFORE HEARING (SRS DISPOSITION) | |
February 24, 2015 | Docket Event | (NON RECORDED) NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSALWITH PREJUDICE | |
February 09, 2015 | Docket Event | PLTF-PET'S MOTIONTO ADOPT ATTACHED SETTLEMENT STIPULATION | |
October 30, 2014 | Docket Event | RESPONSETO MOTION TO DISMISS | |
October 21, 2014 | Docket Event | DEF-RESP'S MOTION TO DISMISSOR FOR A MORE DEFINITE STATEMENT | |
October 09, 2014 | Docket Event | SUMMONS - RETURNED SERVED100614 ROBERT SLONAKER | |
September 30, 2014 | Docket Event | SUMMONS TO BE ISSUEDISSUED ON 10/1/14 | |
September 30, 2014 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF CONFIDENTIAL INFORMATION WITHIN COURT FILE | |
September 30, 2014 | Docket Event | COMPLAINT | |
September 30, 2014 | Docket Event | ATTACHMENT TO COMPLAINTCOMPOSITE EX B- APPLICATION/LOAN ORIGINATION PACKAGE |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.