Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Deuce Enterprises Llc, filed a(n) General Creditor - Creditor case represented by Randall J Love, against Fidelity And Deposit Company Of Maryland, represented by April A Atkins, in the jurisdiction of Pinellas County, FL, . Pinellas County, FL Superior Courts with SCHAFER, WALTER L, JR presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateMay 30, 2014 |
CategoryContracts And Indebtedness - Circuit |
Last RefreshedFebruary 20, 2021 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationPinellas County, FL |
Matter TypeGeneral Creditor |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 09, 2016 | Docket Event |
CANCELED DISMISSAL DATE FOR LACK OF PROSECUTION (12:00 AM) (Judicial Officer SCHAFER, WALTER L, JR) CASE DISMISSED
Judge: SCHAFER, WALTER L, JR |
|
December 15, 2015 | Docket Event |
(NON RECORDED) NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE
Judge: SCHAFER, WALTER L, JR |
|
December 15, 2015 | Docket Event |
CASE DISMISSED - AFTER HEARING (SRS DISPOSITION)
Judge: SCHAFER, WALTER L, JR |
|
December 09, 2015 | Docket Event |
NOTICE-LACK OF PROSECUTION MAILED TO ALL PARTIES
Judge: SCHAFER, WALTER L, JR |
|
December 23, 2014 | Docket Event |
CORRESPONDENCE TO COURT RE PROPOSED AGREED ORDER RCVD BY COURT 121814
Judge: SCHAFER, WALTER L, JR |
|
December 23, 2014 | Docket Event |
AGREED ORDER DEFT SHALL HAVE ADDITIONAL 30 DAYS TO RESPOND TO AMENDED COMPLAINT
Judge: SCHAFER, WALTER L, JR |
|
December 04, 2014 | Docket Event |
AGREED ORDER THAT DEFT SHALL HAVE AN ADDITIONAL 20 DAYS TO RESPOND TO AMENDED COMPLAINT
Judge: SCHAFER, WALTER L, JR |
|
December 04, 2014 | Docket Event |
CORRESPONDENCE TO COURT RE PROPOSED AGREED ORDER RCVD BY COURT 120114
Judge: SCHAFER, WALTER L, JR |
|
September 16, 2014 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF CANCELLATION OF HEARING 092414 9:45
Judge: SCHAFER, WALTER L, JR |
|
July 29, 2014 | Docket Event |
AGREED ORDER THAT DEFT SHALL HAVE A 120 DAY EXTENSION TO RESPOND TO AMENDED COMPLAINT
Judge: SCHAFER, WALTER L, JR |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.