Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
The Bank Of New York Mellon, filed a(n) Foreclosure - Property case represented by Robert Bowen, against Gte Federal Credit Union, Brown, Tabitha, Brown, Jeremy, Brown, Jeffery D, in the jurisdiction of Pinellas County, FL, . Pinellas County, FL Superior Courts with RONDOLINO, ANTHONY presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateMay 30, 2014 |
CategoryReal Prop - Homestead Res Foreclosure3 $250,000 Or More |
Last RefreshedFebruary 20, 2021 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationPinellas County, FL |
Matter TypeForeclosure |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 10, 2015 | Docket Event | CERTIFICATE OF DISBURSEMENTS | |
April 07, 2015 | Docket Event | CERTIFICATE OF TITLEVol./Book 18736, Page 591, 1 pages | |
March 23, 2015 | Docket Event | CERTIFICATE OF SALEBAY TO GULF HOLDINGS LLC | |
March 23, 2015 | Docket Event | JUDICIAL ONLINE SALE (10:00 AM) (Judicial Officer ONLINE SALE, JUDICIAL) REC VER | |
March 06, 2015 | Docket Event | PUBLISHER'S AFFIDAVIT NOTICE OF SALE | |
February 20, 2015 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF SALE | |
February 03, 2015 | Docket Event | CLERK DENIAL OF CONFIDENTIAL INFORMATIONLOAN NUMBER | |
January 30, 2015 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF FILINGAFFIDAVIT OF REASONABLE ATTORNEYS FEES (ATTACHED) | |
January 30, 2015 | Docket Event | FINAL JUDGMENT OF FORECLOSUREVol./Book 18669, Page 641, 6 pages | |
January 30, 2015 | Docket Event | FINAL DISPOSITION FORM |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.