Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
The Realty Associates Fund X Lp As Landlord Promenade At Carillon, filed a(n) Landlord-Tenant - Property case represented by Charles V Barrett, Iii, against Toomey, Kelly, in the jurisdiction of Pinellas County, FL, . Pinellas County, FL Superior Courts with FULLERTON, WALTER presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJanuary 31, 2014 |
CategoryDelinquent Tenant - County |
Last RefreshedOctober 06, 2023 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationPinellas County, FL |
Matter TypeLandlord-Tenant |
This complaint is a legal action to evict a tenant from a property in Pinellas County, Florida. The plaintiff, The Realty Associates Fund X, L.P., is the landlord of the property known as The Promenade at Carillon. The defendant, Kelly Toomey, is the...
WRIT OF POSSESSION RETD EXECUTED
Date: February 24, 2014CERTIFICATE OF MAILING Party: TOOMEY, KELLY
Date: February 05, 2014FINAL JUDGMENT- COUNT 1 POSSESSION IN FAVOR OF PLAINTIFF Vol./Book 18309, Page 1124, 1 pages
Date: February 13, 2014NOTICE FAIR DEBT COLLECTION PRACTICES ACT
Date: January 31, 2014FINAL DISPOSITION FORM
Date: February 11, 2014ATTACHMENT TO COMPLAINT LEASE
Date: January 31, 2014ANSWER OF PRO SE Party: TOOMEY, KELLY
Date: February 12, 2014CIVIL COVER SHEET - E-FILED
Date: January 31, 2014NOTICE 3 DAY NOTICE
Date: January 31, 2014DEFAULT ENTERED BY COURT Party: TOOMEY, KELLY
Date: February 13, 2014EXHIBIT - PRO SE ANSWER OF KELLY TOOMEY
Date: February 11, 2014SUMMONS - SERVED 020514 KELLY TOOMEY
Date: February 10, 2014WRIT OF POSSESSION ISSUED TO ATTORNEY 02/14/14
Date: February 14, 2014PLTF-PET'S MOTION FOR COURT DEFAULT
Date: February 11, 2014COMPLAINT
Date: January 31, 2014AFFIDAVIT AS TO MILITARY SERVICE AND INDEBTEDNESS
Date: February 09, 2014Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 24, 2014 | Docket Event |
WRIT OF POSSESSION RETD EXECUTED
Judge: FULLERTON, WALTER |
|
February 14, 2014 | Docket Event |
WRIT OF POSSESSION ISSUED TO ATTORNEY 02/14/14
Judge: FULLERTON, WALTER |
|
February 13, 2014 | Docket Event |
FINAL JUDGMENT- COUNT 1 POSSESSION IN FAVOR OF PLAINTIFF Vol./Book 18309, Page 1124, 1 pages
Judge: FULLERTON, WALTER |
|
February 13, 2014 | Docket Event |
DEFAULT ENTERED BY COURT Party: TOOMEY, KELLY
Judge: FULLERTON, WALTER |
|
February 13, 2014 | Docket Event |
DEFAULT JUDGMENT (SRS DISPO)
Judge: FULLERTON, WALTER |
|
February 12, 2014 | Docket Event |
ANSWER OF PRO SE Party: TOOMEY, KELLY
Judge: FULLERTON, WALTER |
|
February 11, 2014 | Docket Event |
FINAL DISPOSITION FORM
Judge: FULLERTON, WALTER |
|
February 11, 2014 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT - PRO SE ANSWER OF KELLY TOOMEY
Judge: FULLERTON, WALTER |
|
February 11, 2014 | Docket Event |
PLTF-PET'S MOTION FOR COURT DEFAULT
Judge: FULLERTON, WALTER |
|
February 10, 2014 | Docket Event |
SUMMONS - SERVED 020514 KELLY TOOMEY
Judge: FULLERTON, WALTER |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.