Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Nationstar Mortgage Llc, filed a(n) Foreclosure - Property case represented by Ian D Jagendorf, against Hertz, David, Hertz, Lisa, Tulane Condominium Assoc Of St Petersburg Inc, represented by Shawn G Brown, Esq, in the jurisdiction of Pinellas County, FL, . Pinellas County, FL Superior Courts with CAMPBELL, PAMELA A.M. presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJanuary 31, 2014 |
CategoryReal Prop - Homestead Res Foreclosure2 $50,001 - $249,999 |
Last RefreshedFebruary 20, 2021 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationPinellas County, FL |
Matter TypeForeclosure |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 18, 2015 | Docket Event | RETURNED FROM POST OFFICECERTIFICATE OF TITLE | |
April 24, 2015 | Docket Event | CERTIFICATE OF DISBURSEMENTS | |
April 23, 2015 | Docket Event | CERTIFICATE OF TITLEVol./Book 18755, Page 496, 1 pages | |
April 08, 2015 | Docket Event | ASSIGNMENTOF PURCHASE & SALE AGREEMENT FOR REPLACEMENT PROPERTY | |
April 08, 2015 | Docket Event | JUDICIAL ONLINE SALE (10:00 AM) (Judicial Officer ONLINE SALE, JUDICIAL) REC VER | |
April 08, 2015 | Docket Event | CERTIFICATE OF SALEJAMES AND CAROLEE BLACKMON | |
March 24, 2015 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF SALE | |
March 20, 2015 | Docket Event | PUBLISHER'S AFFIDAVIT NOTICE OF SALE | |
February 17, 2015 | Docket Event | UNIFORM FINAL JUDGMENT - BACKLOG PROJECT (SRS) | |
February 17, 2015 | Docket Event | FINAL DISPOSITION FORM |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.