Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
I R C Integral Rehabilitation Center Llc, filed a(n) General Small Claims - Small Claims case represented by Kendrick J Blackwell, Esq, against State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company, represented by Anthony Joseph Parrino, in the jurisdiction of Pinellas County, FL, . Pinellas County, FL Superior Courts with CARASSAS, JOHN presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJanuary 31, 2014 |
CategorySmall Claims Pip 2 - $100 - $500 |
Last RefreshedSeptember 16, 2023 |
Practice AreaSmall Claims |
Filing LocationPinellas County, FL |
Matter TypeGeneral Small Claims |
This complaint is filed by I.R.C. (Integral Rehabilitation Center), LLC, as the assignee of Rosa C Valle, against State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company. The complaint seeks unpaid PIP benefits and addresses a dispute over the Defendant's obl...
AMENDED COMPLAINT
Date: March 10, 2014DESIGNATION OF E-MAIL ADDRESS(ES)
Date: March 10, 2014(NON RECORDED) NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE
Date: August 07, 2014EXHIBIT ASSIGNMENT OF BENEFITS
Date: January 31, 2014COMPLAINT E-FILED
Date: January 31, 2014NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES
Date: April 28, 2014NOTICE OF SERVICE ANSWERS INTERROGATORIES
Date: April 17, 2014NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION
Date: April 14, 2014NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES
Date: January 31, 2014ANSWER-AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES OF STATE FARM
Date: April 03, 2014EXHIBIT ASSIGNMENT OF BENEFITS
Date: March 10, 2014REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS
Date: January 31, 2014PRE-TRIAL CONFERENCE ORDER
Date: March 13, 2014NOTICE-STMT OF CLAIM-DEFT VIA ATTORNEY Party: STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY
Date: February 05, 2014DESIGNATION OF E-MAIL ADDRESS(ES) AMENDED
Date: July 29, 2014REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION
Date: April 28, 2014NOTICE OF SERVICE ANSWERS INTERROGATORIES
Date: April 10, 2014RESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION
Date: April 10, 2014CORRESPONDENCE TO COURT RE PROPOSED ORDER
Date: March 13, 2014(NON RECORDED) NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL W/OUT PREJUDICE
Date: March 30, 2015(NON RECORDED) NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE (AMENDED)
Date: November 16, 2015REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION
Date: January 31, 2014NOTICE TO PLTF-PLTF ATTY
Date: February 05, 2014(NON RECORDED) NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE
Date: November 16, 2015RESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS
Date: April 10, 2014Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
November 16, 2015 | Docket Event |
(NON RECORDED) NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE (AMENDED)
Judge: SMALL CLAIMS JUDGE, NORTH |
|
November 16, 2015 | Docket Event |
(NON RECORDED) NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE
Judge: SMALL CLAIMS JUDGE, NORTH |
|
March 30, 2015 | Docket Event |
(NON RECORDED) NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL W/OUT PREJUDICE
Judge: SMALL CLAIMS JUDGE, NORTH |
|
August 07, 2014 | Docket Event |
(NON RECORDED) NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE
Judge: SMALL CLAIMS JUDGE, NORTH |
|
August 07, 2014 | Docket Event |
CASE DISMISSED - BEFORE HEARING (SRS DISPOSITION)
Judge: SMALL CLAIMS JUDGE, NORTH |
|
July 29, 2014 | Docket Event |
DESIGNATION OF E-MAIL ADDRESS(ES) AMENDED
Judge: SMALL CLAIMS JUDGE, NORTH |
|
April 28, 2014 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES
Judge: SMALL CLAIMS JUDGE, NORTH |
|
April 28, 2014 | Docket Event |
REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION
Judge: SMALL CLAIMS JUDGE, NORTH |
|
April 17, 2014 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF SERVICE ANSWERS INTERROGATORIES
Judge: SMALL CLAIMS JUDGE, NORTH |
|
April 14, 2014 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION
Judge: SMALL CLAIMS JUDGE, NORTH |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.