Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Spinecare Associates Llc, filed a(n) General Small Claims - Small Claims case represented by Stephen Barett Farkas, against Ocean Harbor Casualty Insurance Company, represented by Lawrence D Popritkin, Esq, in the jurisdiction of Pinellas County, FL, . Pinellas County, FL Superior Courts with CARASSAS, JOHN presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJanuary 31, 2014 |
CategorySmall Claims Pip 3 - $501 - $2,500 |
Last RefreshedSeptember 16, 2023 |
Practice AreaSmall Claims |
Filing LocationPinellas County, FL |
Matter TypeGeneral Small Claims |
(NON RECORDED) NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL W/O PREJUDICE
Date: March 27, 2014REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION
Date: January 31, 2014NOTICE TO PLTF-PLTF ATTY
Date: February 06, 2014STATEMENT OF CLAIM - E-FILED
Date: January 31, 2014FINAL DISPOSITION FORM
Date: March 27, 2014NOTICE OF APPEARANCE
Date: February 26, 2014COMPLAINT E-FILED
Date: January 31, 2014SUMMONS-NOTICE EMAILED TO ATTY-PLTF FOR SERVICE Party: OCEAN HARBOR CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY
Date: February 06, 2014ATTACHMENT TO COMPLAINT PATIENT FINANCIAL POLICY
Date: January 31, 2014NOTICE-STMT OF CLAIM-DEFT VIA ATTORNEY Party: OCEAN HARBOR CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY
Date: February 06, 2014NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES
Date: January 31, 2014ATTACHMENT TO COMPLAINT DEMAND LETTER
Date: January 31, 2014REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS
Date: January 31, 2014CIVIL COVER SHEET - E-FILED
Date: January 31, 2014DEF-RESP'S MOTION TO INVOKE FLORIDA RULES OF CIVIL PROCEDURE
Date: February 26, 2014Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 28, 2014 | Docket Event |
CASE DISMISSED - AFTER HEARING (SRS DISPOSITION)
Judge: SMALL CLAIMS JUDGE, NORTH |
|
March 27, 2014 | Docket Event |
(NON RECORDED) NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL W/O PREJUDICE
Judge: SMALL CLAIMS JUDGE, NORTH |
|
March 27, 2014 | Docket Event |
FINAL DISPOSITION FORM
Judge: SMALL CLAIMS JUDGE, NORTH |
|
March 04, 2014 | Docket Event |
SMALL CLAIMS PRE TRIAL ICD (11:30 AM) (Judicial Officer CARASSAS, JOHN) Result: SC HEARING HELD
Judge: SMALL CLAIMS JUDGE, NORTH |
|
March 04, 2014 | Docket Event |
PRE-TRIAL CONTINUED PENDING RE DISCOVERY
Judge: SMALL CLAIMS JUDGE, NORTH |
|
February 26, 2014 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE
Judge: SMALL CLAIMS JUDGE, NORTH |
|
February 26, 2014 | Docket Event |
DEF-RESP'S MOTION TO INVOKE FLORIDA RULES OF CIVIL PROCEDURE
Judge: SMALL CLAIMS JUDGE, NORTH |
|
February 26, 2014 | Docket Event |
DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL
Judge: SMALL CLAIMS JUDGE, NORTH |
|
February 06, 2014 | Docket Event |
NOTICE TO PLTF-PLTF ATTY
Judge: SMALL CLAIMS JUDGE, NORTH |
|
February 06, 2014 | Docket Event |
SUMMONS-NOTICE EMAILED TO ATTY-PLTF FOR SERVICE Party: OCEAN HARBOR CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY
Judge: SMALL CLAIMS JUDGE, NORTH |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.