Case Last Refreshed: 4 months ago
filed a(n) case in the jurisdiction of Pinellas County, FL, . Pinellas County, FL Superior Courts with John Carassas presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJanuary 31, 2014 |
|
Last RefreshedDecember 18, 2023 |
|
Filing LocationPinellas County, FL |
|
This complaint is filed by MRI Associates of Palm Harbor, Inc. d/b/a Palm Harbor MRI on behalf of Jennifer Knutson against State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company. The plaintiff is a Florida corporation, while the defendant is a foreign compan...
ANSWER-AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES OF STATE FARM
Date: March 12, 2014REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS
Date: January 31, 2014ORDER FLORIDA RULES OF CIVIL PROCEDURE ARE APPLIED
Date: March 20, 2014COURT WORKSHEET
Date: May 27, 2014NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES
Date: January 31, 2014ATTACHMENT TO COMPLAINT ASSIGNMENT OF BENEFITS
Date: January 31, 2014NOTICE OF CANCELLATION OF DEPO
Date: July 23, 2015REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION
Date: January 31, 2014NOTICE OF CANCELLATION OF DEPOSITION
Date: June 26, 2015NOTICE OF SERVICE OF RESPONSES TO REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION
Date: May 22, 2014ATTACHMENT TO COMPLAINT DEMAND LETTER
Date: January 31, 2014NOTICE OF PRODUCTION FROM NON-PARTY 052715
Date: May 27, 2015NOTICE OF FILING AFFD OF GOOD CAUSE
Date: January 16, 2015NOTICE TO PLTF-PLTF ATTY
Date: February 05, 2014CORRESPONDENCE TO COURT RE AGREED ORDER
Date: June 06, 2014NOTICE OF SERVICE ANSWERS INTERROGATORIES
Date: April 22, 2014NOTICE OF PRODUCTION FROM NON-PARTY 031915
Date: March 19, 2015NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES
Date: March 21, 2014NOTICE OF CANCELLATION OF HEARING 052714 10:00
Date: May 23, 2014CORRESPONDENCE TO COURT RE PROPOSED ORDER
Date: March 20, 2014NOTICE-STMT OF CLAIM-DEFT VIA ATTORNEY Party: STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY
Date: February 05, 2014NOTICE OF SERVICE ANSWERS INTERROGATORIES
Date: June 04, 2014STATEMENT OF CLAIM - E-FILED
Date: January 31, 2014NOTICE OF PRODUCTION FROM NON-PARTY 061015 W/ ATTD UNSIGNED SUBPOENAS
Date: June 10, 2015(NON RECORDED) NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE
Date: July 22, 2015NOTICE OF SERVICE ANSWERS INTERROGATORIES
Date: May 22, 2014CIVIL COVER SHEET - E-FILED
Date: January 31, 2014PRE-TRIAL CONFERENCE ORDER
Date: April 01, 2014FINAL DISPOSITION FORM
Date: July 22, 2015ANSWER-AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES OF STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE
Date: June 09, 2014REPLY TO AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES AND MOTION TO STRIKE
Date: March 28, 2014REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION
Date: March 21, 2014DESIGNATION OF E-MAIL ADDRESS(ES)
Date: March 21, 2014REQUEST FOR ALIAS SUMMONS
Date: January 16, 2015AGREED ORDER ON MOTION TO STRIKE/10 DAYS
Date: June 06, 2014NOTICE OF HEARING 052714 10:00 J/CARASSAS
Date: April 15, 2014NOTICE OF APPEARANCE
Date: May 07, 2015SMALL CLAIMS PRE TRIAL ICD (11:30 AM) (Judicial Officer CARASSAS, JOHN) Result: SC HEARING HELD
Date: February 10, 2015COMPLAINT E-FILED
Date: January 31, 2014CORRESPONDENCE TO COURT RE PRE-TRIAL ORDER
Date: April 01, 2014RESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS
Date: March 12, 2014ALIAS NOTICE TO PLTF-PLTF ATTY
Date: January 20, 2015JOINT STIPULATION TO APPLY FULL FLORIDA RULES OF CIVIL PROCEDURE
Date: March 12, 2014NOT. OF SERV. OF PROPOSAL FOR SETTLEMENT /OFFER OF JUDGMENT
Date: May 23, 2014PRIVILEGE LOG
Date: April 22, 2014NOTICE OF PRODUCTION FROM NON-PARTY 041715
Date: April 17, 2015RESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION
Date: April 22, 2014NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION W/ATATCHED SIGNED SUBPOENA
Date: June 23, 2015Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 23, 2015 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF CANCELLATION OF DEPO
Judge: SMALL CLAIMS JUDGE, NORTH |
|
July 22, 2015 | Docket Event |
(NON RECORDED) NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE
Judge: SMALL CLAIMS JUDGE, NORTH |
|
July 22, 2015 | Docket Event |
FINAL DISPOSITION FORM
Judge: SMALL CLAIMS JUDGE, NORTH |
|
July 22, 2015 | Docket Event |
CASE DISMISSED - AFTER HEARING (SRS DISPOSITION)
Judge: SMALL CLAIMS JUDGE, NORTH |
|
June 26, 2015 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF CANCELLATION OF DEPOSITION
Judge: SMALL CLAIMS JUDGE, NORTH |
|
June 23, 2015 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION W/ATATCHED SIGNED SUBPOENA
Judge: SMALL CLAIMS JUDGE, NORTH |
|
June 10, 2015 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF PRODUCTION FROM NON-PARTY 061015 W/ ATTD UNSIGNED SUBPOENAS
Judge: SMALL CLAIMS JUDGE, NORTH |
|
May 27, 2015 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF PRODUCTION FROM NON-PARTY 052715
Judge: SMALL CLAIMS JUDGE, NORTH |
|
May 07, 2015 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE
Judge: SMALL CLAIMS JUDGE, NORTH |
|
April 17, 2015 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF PRODUCTION FROM NON-PARTY 041715
Judge: SMALL CLAIMS JUDGE, NORTH |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.