Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Farrow, Charisse A, filed a(n) Domestic Violence - Family case against Farrow, Charles J, in the jurisdiction of Pinellas County, FL, . Pinellas County, FL Superior Courts with HELINGER, JACK presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 20, 2013 |
CategoryDomestic Violence Injunction With Kids |
Last RefreshedJanuary 25, 2022 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationPinellas County, FL |
Matter TypeDomestic Violence |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 30, 2014 | Docket Event |
CERTIFIED MAIL RECEIPT RETURNED
Judge: HELINGER, JACK |
|
May 14, 2014 | Docket Event |
ORDER ON HEARING FOR COMPLIANCE
Judge: HELINGER, JACK |
|
May 14, 2014 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF CURRENT ADDRESS PRO SE
Judge: HELINGER, JACK |
|
May 05, 2014 | Docket Event |
CORRESPONDENCE TO COURT RE ASSESSMENT RECD BY CT 032514
Judge: HELINGER, JACK |
|
March 18, 2014 | Docket Event |
ORDER SETTING COMPLIANCE HEARING 051314 10:00
Judge: HELINGER, JACK |
|
February 17, 2014 | Docket Event |
ORDER DENYING MOTN TO DISMISS INJUNCTION
Judge: HELINGER, JACK |
|
February 05, 2014 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF HEARING 021714 10:15
Judge: HELINGER, JACK |
|
February 03, 2014 | Docket Event |
PLTF-PET'S MOTION TO DISMISS
Judge: HELINGER, JACK |
|
January 13, 2014 | Docket Event |
AFFIDAVIT-SERVICE OF PROCESS ORDR SETTING HEARING Party: FARROW, CHARLES J
Judge: HELINGER, JACK |
|
January 06, 2014 | Docket Event |
RECOMMENDATION OF GENERAL MAGISTRATE /ORDR SUPERVISED TIMESHARING
Judge: HELINGER, JACK |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.