Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Trask, Thomas J, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case against Trask, Laura Anne Frazier, in the jurisdiction of Pinellas County, FL, . Pinellas County, FL Superior Courts with MUSCARELLA, PATRICIA ANN presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 19, 2013 |
CategoryDissolution Of Marriage - With Children |
Last RefreshedOctober 13, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationPinellas County, FL |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 20, 2015 | Docket Event |
QUALIFIED DOMESTIC RELATIONS ORDER
Judge: MUSCARELLA, PATRICIA ANN |
|
June 18, 2015 | Docket Event |
CERTIFIED STATEMENT COMPLETED BY CLERK
Judge: MUSCARELLA, PATRICIA ANN |
|
June 03, 2015 | Docket Event |
FINAL DISPOSITION FORM
Judge: MUSCARELLA, PATRICIA ANN |
|
June 03, 2015 | Docket Event |
FINAL JUDGMENT OF DISSOLUTION Vol./Book 18810, Page 842, 44 pages
Judge: MUSCARELLA, PATRICIA ANN |
|
June 03, 2015 | Docket Event |
FINAL JUDGMENT OF DISSOLUTION (SRS) Vol./Book 18810, Page 842, 44 pages
Judge: MUSCARELLA, PATRICIA ANN |
|
June 02, 2015 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF HEARING 060315 3:30
Judge: MUSCARELLA, PATRICIA ANN |
|
May 07, 2015 | Docket Event |
ORDER APPROVING ATTACHED MEDIATED STIPULATION Vol./Book 18778, Page 993, 21 pages
Judge: MUSCARELLA, PATRICIA ANN |
|
May 07, 2015 | Docket Event |
NOTICE FINAL DISPO OF FAMILY MEDIATION SETTLED
Judge: MUSCARELLA, PATRICIA ANN |
|
May 01, 2015 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT 8- ESTIMATED FUNDS
Judge: MUSCARELLA, PATRICIA ANN |
|
May 01, 2015 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT 3- COUNTER PETITION
Judge: MUSCARELLA, PATRICIA ANN |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.