Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Raynes, Lowell Gerard, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case against Henagar Raynes, Edna Kathern, in the jurisdiction of Pinellas County, FL, . Pinellas County, FL Superior Courts with SCHAEFER, JOHN A presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 19, 2013 |
CategoryDissolution Of Marriage - No Children |
Last RefreshedDecember 26, 2020 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationPinellas County, FL |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 18, 2014 | Docket Event |
CERTIFIED STATEMENT COMPLETED BY CLERK
Judge: SCHAEFER, JOHN A |
|
April 15, 2014 | Docket Event |
FINAL JUDGMENT OF DISSOLUTION (SRS) Vol./Book 18372, Page 2260, 1 pages
Judge: SCHAEFER, JOHN A |
|
April 15, 2014 | Docket Event |
RECOMMENDATION OF GENERAL MAGISTRATE
Judge: SCHAEFER, JOHN A |
|
April 15, 2014 | Docket Event |
FINAL DISPOSITION FORM
Judge: SCHAEFER, JOHN A |
|
January 30, 2014 | Docket Event |
ORDER OF REFERENCE TO GENERAL MAGISTRATE
Judge: SCHAEFER, JOHN A |
|
January 17, 2014 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF HEARING 032614 3:45 PRO SE
Judge: SCHAEFER, JOHN A |
|
January 08, 2014 | Docket Event |
ACCEPTANCE /WAIVER OF SERVICE OF PROCESS
Judge: SCHAEFER, JOHN A |
|
January 08, 2014 | Docket Event |
WAIVER-RESPONSE AND REQUEST FOR COPY OF FINAL JUDGMENT PRO SE
Judge: SCHAEFER, JOHN A |
|
January 08, 2014 | Docket Event |
SEALED SOCIAL SECURITY NUMBER PLAINTIFF - PETITIONER
Judge: SCHAEFER, JOHN A |
|
January 08, 2014 | Docket Event |
COPY OF DRIVERS LICENSE (RESPONDENT)
Judge: SCHAEFER, JOHN A |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.