Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Green Tree Servicing Llc, filed a(n) Foreclosure - Property case represented by Timothy D Padgett, against Fitzgerald, Peter A, Lakeside Crossing Condominium Association Inc, represented by Joseph R Cianfrone, in the jurisdiction of Pinellas County, FL, . Pinellas County, FL Superior Courts with DAY, JACK presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 20, 2013 |
CategoryReal Prop - Non-Homestead Res Foreclosure2 $50,001-$249,999 |
Last RefreshedFebruary 20, 2021 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationPinellas County, FL |
Matter TypeForeclosure |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 21, 2014 | Docket Event | CERTIFICATE OF NO DISBURSEMENT | |
August 21, 2014 | Docket Event | CERTIFICATE OF TITLE Vol./Book 18510, Page 1640, 2 pages | |
August 08, 2014 | Docket Event | CERTIFICATE OF SALE GREEN TREE SERVICING LLC | |
August 08, 2014 | Docket Event | JUDICIAL ONLINE SALE (10:00 AM) (Judicial Officer ONLINE SALE, JUDICIAL) REC VER | |
August 06, 2014 | Docket Event | ASSIGNMENT OF BID | |
August 05, 2014 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF SALE | |
July 18, 2014 | Docket Event | PUBLISHER'S AFFIDAVIT NOTICE OF SALE | |
June 24, 2014 | Docket Event | JUDGMENT (SRS) | |
June 24, 2014 | Docket Event | FINAL JUDGMENT OF FORECLOSURE Vol./Book 18448, Page 426, 6 pages | |
June 24, 2014 | Docket Event | FINAL DISPOSITION FORM |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.