Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Cavalry Spv I Llc, filed a(n) General Creditor - Creditor case represented by Thomas Lobello Iii, Esq, against Jones, Marie, in the jurisdiction of Pinellas County, FL, . Pinellas County, FL Superior Courts with CARASSAS, JOHN presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 20, 2013 |
CategoryContracts And Indebtedness - County |
Last RefreshedSeptember 16, 2023 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationPinellas County, FL |
Matter TypeGeneral Creditor |
This complaint is a legal document filed by Cavalry SPV I, LLC against Marie Jones in the County Court, Sixth Judicial Circuit, in and for Pinellas County, Florida. The plaintiff is seeking damages from the defendant. The amount of damages being clai...
ATTACHMENT TO COMPLAINT EXHIBIT B - BILL OF SALE AND ASSIGNMENT OF LOANS
Date: December 20, 2013STIPULATION FOR PAYMENTS
Date: February 05, 2014CIVIL COVER SHEET - E-FILED
Date: December 20, 2013SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED
Date: December 20, 2013COMPLAINT
Date: December 20, 2013ATTACHMENT TO COMPLAINT EXHIBIT A - ACCOUNT STATEMENT
Date: December 20, 2013STIPULATION-ORDER APPROVING PAYMENT Vol./Book 18306, Page 1673, 1 pages
Date: February 10, 2014SUMMONS - SERVED 021314 MARIE JONES
Date: April 08, 2014ATTORNEY COVER LETTER
Date: February 10, 2014(NON RECORDED) NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE
Date: June 13, 2014SUMMONS-NOTICE EMAILED TO ATTY-PLTF FOR SERVICE Party: JONES, MARIE
Date: December 23, 2013Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 13, 2014 | Docket Event |
(NON RECORDED) NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE
Judge: CARASSAS, JOHN |
|
April 08, 2014 | Docket Event |
SUMMONS - SERVED 021314 MARIE JONES
Judge: CARASSAS, JOHN |
|
February 10, 2014 | Docket Event |
STIPULATION-ORDER APPROVING PAYMENT Vol./Book 18306, Page 1673, 1 pages
Judge: CARASSAS, JOHN |
|
February 10, 2014 | Docket Event |
ATTORNEY COVER LETTER
Judge: CARASSAS, JOHN |
|
February 05, 2014 | Docket Event |
STIPULATION FOR PAYMENTS
Judge: CARASSAS, JOHN |
|
December 23, 2013 | Docket Event |
SUMMONS-NOTICE EMAILED TO ATTY-PLTF FOR SERVICE Party: JONES, MARIE
Judge: CARASSAS, JOHN |
|
December 20, 2013 | Docket Event |
ATTACHMENT TO COMPLAINT EXHIBIT B - BILL OF SALE AND ASSIGNMENT OF LOANS
Judge: CARASSAS, JOHN |
|
December 20, 2013 | Docket Event |
CIVIL COVER SHEET - E-FILED
Judge: CARASSAS, JOHN |
|
December 20, 2013 | Docket Event |
SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED
Judge: CARASSAS, JOHN |
|
December 20, 2013 | Docket Event |
COMPLAINT
Judge: CARASSAS, JOHN |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.